Vann v. Freeman et al
Plaintiff: Ashley Vann
Defendant: Law Offices of Jeffrey S. Freeman and Jeffrey S. Freeman
Case Number: 2:2021cv10721
Filed: March 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Paul D Borman
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2021 Filing 22 REPLY to Response re #15 MOTION to Stay Proceedings (In Support of Motion) filed by All Defendants. (Richotte, Joseph)
May 11, 2021 Filing 21 RESPONSE to #17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint filed by Ashley Vann. (Neuman, Kenneth)
May 11, 2021 Filing 20 RESPONSE to #15 MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Ashley Vann. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Complaint and Demand For Jury Trial (ECF No. 1), #3 Exhibit 2 - Order Denying in Part Motion For Partial Stay of Discovery (ECF No. 136 - Case No. 14-11700)) (Neuman, Kenneth)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge David R. Grand: #15 MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Law Offices of Jeffrey S. Freeman, Jeffrey S. Freeman, #17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint filed by Law Offices of Jeffrey S. Freeman, Jeffrey S. Freeman. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Seal. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
April 28, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by All Defendants. (Richotte, Joseph)
April 28, 2021 Filing 16 SEALED MOTION Stay Proceedings by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Richotte, Joseph)
April 28, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Stay Proceedings by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Richotte, Joseph)
April 28, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Seal Exhibit and Memorandum by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Richotte, Joseph)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATED ORDER to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading re #1 Complaint,,, filed by Ashley Vann. Response due by 5/1/2021 Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
April 19, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by George B. Donnini on behalf of Jeffrey S. Freeman, Law Offices of Jeffrey S. Freeman. (Donnini, George)
April 19, 2021 Filing 11 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by All Defendants (Richotte, Joseph)
April 19, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph E. Richotte on behalf of All Defendants. (Richotte, Joseph)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER finding satisfied #5 Order to Show Cause filed by Ashley Vann. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
April 6, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Ashley Vann. (Grieco, Jennifer)
April 5, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Law Offices of Jeffrey S. Freeman served on 4/1/2021, answer due 4/22/2021. (Neuman, Kenneth)
April 5, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Jeffrey S. Freeman served on 4/1/2021, answer due 4/22/2021. (Neuman, Kenneth)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Ashley Vann to Show Cause as to complete-diversity; Show Cause Response due by 4/15/2021 Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
April 1, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Law Offices of Jeffrey S. Freeman* (DAll)
April 1, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Jeffrey S. Freeman* (DAll)
March 31, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer M. Grieco on behalf of Ashley Vann. (Grieco, Jennifer)
March 31, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand For Jury Trial filed by Ashley Vann against Jeffrey S. Freeman, Law Offices of Jeffrey S. Freeman with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8407541 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of Country - County Where Action Arose: Oakland County - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland County. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Freeman Email and Letter dated 11/16/2012, #3 Exhibit 2 - Freeman Letter dated 5/22/19 with Transcripts, #4 Exhibit 3 - Freeman Letter dated 9/18/13, #5 Exhibit 4 - Freeman Letter dated 5/30/19, #6 Exhibit 5 - Transcripts) (Neuman, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vann v. Freeman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Offices of Jeffrey S. Freeman
Represented By: Joseph E. Richotte
Represented By: George B. Donnini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey S. Freeman
Represented By: Joseph E. Richotte
Represented By: George B. Donnini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Vann
Represented By: Jennifer M. Grieco
Represented By: Kenneth F. Neuman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?