Hatcher v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: James Daniel Hatcher
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2021cv10843
Filed: April 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Mark A Goldsmith
Referring Judge: Curtis Ivy
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security served on 5/17/2021, answer due 7/16/2021. (Olinsky, Howard)
May 14, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel S. Tarabelli on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. (Tarabelli, Daniel)
April 20, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued for *Commissioner of Social Security* (NAhm)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Curtis Ivy, Jr. (MacKay, K)
April 16, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph E. Houle on behalf of James Daniel Hatcher. (Houle, Joseph)
April 16, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Referral of Social Security Case to Magistrate Judge Curtis Ivy, Jr. (TTho)
April 16, 2021 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (TTho)
April 15, 2021 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by James Daniel Hatcher. (Olinsky, Howard)
April 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by James Daniel Hatcher against Commissioner of Social Security. Plaintiff requests summons issued. IFP Application to Follow. County of 1st Plaintiff: Isabella - County Where Action Arose: Isabella - County of 1st Defendant: Isabella. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons) (Olinsky, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hatcher v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Daniel S. Tarabelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Daniel Hatcher
Represented By: Howard D. Olinsky
Represented By: Joseph E. Houle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?