MARY HARRIS, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ashley Harris, Deceased v. CORIZON HEALTH, INC., doing business as CORIZON OF MICHIGAN et al
Plaintiff: MARY HARRIS, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ashley Harris, Deceased
Defendant: M.D. VINCENT PERNELL, CORIZON HEALTH, INC., doing business as CORIZON OF MICHIGAN, OFFICER HEAD, JOHN DOES 1-12, RN LILLIE HARDIN-COLLINS and MA, LLP SANDRA J. TAYLOR
Case Number: 2:2021cv10876
Filed: April 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Mark A Goldsmith
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by CORIZON HEALTH, INC., doing business as CORIZON OF MICHIGAN, VINCENT PERNELL (Lanesky, Jonathan)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by CORIZON HEALTH, INC., doing business as CORIZON OF MICHIGAN, VINCENT PERNELL. (Lanesky, Jonathan)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATED ORDER Extending the Deadline to File a Responsive Pleading (Answer due 6/24/2021). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (KSan)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Elizabeth Trudgeon on behalf of LILLIE HARDIN-COLLINS. (Trudgeon, Sara)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by John L. Thurber on behalf of LILLIE HARDIN-COLLINS. (Thurber, John)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATED ORDER Extending the Deadline to File a Responsive Pleading (Answer due 6/24/2021). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (KSan)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Elizabeth Trudgeon on behalf of OFFICER HEAD. (Trudgeon, Sara)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by John L. Thurber on behalf of OFFICER HEAD. (Thurber, John)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATED ORDER Extending the Deadline to File a Responsive Pleading (Answer due by 6/24/2021). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (KSan)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Elizabeth Trudgeon on behalf of SANDRA J. TAYLOR. (Trudgeon, Sara)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by John L. Thurber on behalf of SANDRA J. TAYLOR. (Thurber, John)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kristin Totten appearing on behalf of MARY HARRIS, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ashley Harris, Deceased (Totten, Kristin)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. VINCENT PERNELL served on 5/3/2021, answer due 5/24/2021. (Chocron, Steffani)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. CORIZON HEALTH, INC., doing business as CORIZON OF MICHIGAN served on 4/27/2021, answer due 5/18/2021. (Chocron, Steffani)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. SANDRA J. TAYLOR served on 5/7/2021, answer due 5/28/2021. (Chocron, Steffani)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. OFFICER HEAD served on 5/15/2021, answer due 6/7/2021. (Chocron, Steffani)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. LILLIE HARDIN-COLLINS served on 5/18/2021, answer due 6/8/2021. (Chocron, Steffani)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATED ORDER Granting Defendants Corizon Health, Inc. an Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading ( Responsive pleading due by 6/17/2021 ). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (KSan)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by CORIZON HEALTH, INC., doing business as CORIZON OF MICHIGAN (Lanesky, Jonathan)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jonathan C. Lanesky appearing on behalf of CORIZON HEALTH, INC., doing business as CORIZON OF MICHIGAN, VINCENT PERNELL (Lanesky, Jonathan)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Ronald W. Chapman appearing on behalf of CORIZON HEALTH, INC., doing business as CORIZON OF MICHIGAN, VINCENT PERNELL (Chapman, Ronald)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kyle M. Williams appearing on behalf of MARY HARRIS, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ashley Harris, Deceased (Williams, Kyle)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *CORIZON HEALTH, INC., doing business as CORIZON OF MICHIGAN, LILLIE HARDIN-COLLINS, JOHN DOES 1-12, OFFICER HEAD, VINCENT PERNELL, SANDRA J. TAYLOR* (TTho)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8431124 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Washtenaw - County Where Action Arose: Washtenaw - County of 1st Defendant: Washtenaw. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Merit Dr. Kirstein, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Merit Stephen Furman, RN, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Merit Susan Clark, MA, LLP) (Chocron, Steffani)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (TTho)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MARY HARRIS, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ashley Harris, Deceased v. CORIZON HEALTH, INC., doing business as CORIZON OF MICHIGAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. VINCENT PERNELL
Represented By: Ronald W. Chapman
Represented By: Jonathan C. Lanesky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORIZON HEALTH, INC., doing business as CORIZON OF MICHIGAN
Represented By: Ronald W. Chapman
Represented By: Jonathan C. Lanesky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER HEAD
Represented By: John L. Thurber
Represented By: Sara Elizabeth Trudgeon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-12
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RN LILLIE HARDIN-COLLINS
Represented By: John L. Thurber
Represented By: Sara Elizabeth Trudgeon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MA, LLP SANDRA J. TAYLOR
Represented By: John L. Thurber
Represented By: Sara Elizabeth Trudgeon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY HARRIS, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ashley Harris, Deceased
Represented By: Steffani E. Chocron
Represented By: Kristin Totten
Represented By: Kyle M. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?