FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, d/b/a Fannie Mae v. River Houze, LLC
Plaintiff: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, d/b/a Fannie Mae
Defendant: River Houze, LLC
Intervenor: LivRiverHouze, LLC, River Houze Junior, LLC and Arie Leibovitz Living Trust u/a/d June 4, 1986
Receiver: Ronald L. Glass
Case Number: 2:2021cv10958
Filed: April 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Gershwin A Drain
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2021 Filing 37 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 7/19/2021 at 3:00 PM before District Judge Gershwin A. Drain (TMcg)
June 11, 2021 Filing 36 BOND in the amount of $ 10,000.00 posted by Ronald L. Glass (Uetz, Ann Marie)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION AND ORDER By and Between Federal National Mortgage Association and River Houze LLC to Appoint Ronald L. Glass to Oversee Property, re #3 MOTION to Appoint Receiver and for Preliminary Relief - Expedited Consideration Requested Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg)
June 10, 2021 Filing 34 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE: Status Conference set for 6/10/2021 09:30 AM before District Judge Gershwin A. Drain (TMcg)
June 10, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Gershwin A. Drain: Zoom Status Conference held on 6/10/2021 [MOTION HEARING NOT HELD] (Court Reporter: Merilyn Jones) (TMcg)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Regarding June 10, 2021 Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Receiver and Preliminary Relief #26 Notice of Hearing on Motion,. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg)
June 8, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, d/b/a Fannie Mae re #27 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Amended Disclosure of Potential Witnesses (Uetz, Ann Marie)
June 8, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE by River Houze, LLC THAT IT WILL CALL WITNESSES (Lannen, Patrick)
June 4, 2021 Filing 30 TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on 5/5/2021. (Court Reporter: Merilyn Jones) (Number of Pages: 29) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 6/25/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/6/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/2/2021. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/www.transcriptorders.com before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Jones, M)
June 4, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, d/b/a Fannie Mae re #27 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Disclosure of Potential Witnesses (Uetz, Ann Marie)
June 1, 2021 Filing 28 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by River Houze, LLC. (Johnson, Erik)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Regardining May 28, 2021 Status Conference and Setting New Hearing DAte,, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings, #26 Notice of Hearing on Motion,., ( Response due by noon on 6/4/2021) Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg)
May 28, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE OF HEARING BY VIDEO CONFERENCE on #3 MOTION to Appoint Receiver and for Preliminary Relief - Expedited Consideration Requested. Motion Hearing reset for 6/10/2021 at 9:30 AM before District Judge Gershwin A. Drain |Zoom Webinar Information: https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1610253976?pwd=T1YxdEdEdU1xOWJwZVpWNlhwVWkxQT09 Passcode: 452123 Or One tap mobile : US: +16692545252,,1610253976# or +16468287666,,1610253976#| (TMcg)
May 28, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael F. Jacobson on behalf of River Houze, LLC. (Jacobson, Michael)
May 28, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Gershwin A. Drain: Status Conference held on 5/28/2021, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings as to #3 MOTION to Appoint Receiver and for Preliminary Relief - Expedited Consideration Requested :( Motion Hearing set for 6/10/2021 at 9:30 AM before District Judge Gershwin A. Drain) (Court Reporter: Merilyn Jones) (TMcg)
May 26, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE: Status Conference set for 5/28/2021 at 11:00 AM before District Judge Gershwin A. Drain (TMcg)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting #20 Motion for Limited Intervention on Behalf of Fifty Percent (50%) Owners of Defendant; Mooting Ex Parte #22 Motion to Expedite Hearing; and Adjourning Hearing on #3 Motion to Appoint Receiver and for Preliminary Relief. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg)
May 20, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Gershwin A. Drain: Zoom Motion Hearing/Status Conference held on 5/20/2021 re #20 MOTION to Intervene - MOTION FOR LIMITED INTERVENTION ON BEHALF OF FIFTY PERCENT (50%) OWNERS OF DEFENDANT filed by River Houze Junior, LLC, Arie Leibovitz Living Trust u/a/d June 4, 1986, #22 Ex Parte MOTION to Expedite - EX PARTE MOTION FOR EXPEDITED HEARING ON: MOTION FOR LIMITED INTERVENTION ON BEHALF OF FIFTY PERCENT (50%) OWNERS OF DEFENDANT [ECF No. 20] filed by River Houze Junior, LLC, Arie Leibovitz Living Trust u/a/d June 4, 1986, #3 MOTION to Appoint Receiver and for Preliminary Relief - Expedited Consideration Requested filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, d/b/a Fannie Mae, Status Conference held on 5/20/2021 Disposition: Motion adjourned (Court Reporter: Shacara Mapp) (TMcg)
May 17, 2021 Filing 22 Ex Parte MOTION to Expedite - EX PARTE MOTION FOR EXPEDITED HEARING ON: MOTION FOR LIMITED INTERVENTION ON BEHALF OF FIFTY PERCENT (50%) OWNERS OF DEFENDANT [ECF No. 20] by Arie Leibovitz Living Trust u/a/d June 4, 1986, River Houze Junior, LLC. (Weisberg, Robert)
May 17, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert A. Weisberg on behalf of Arie Leibovitz Living Trust u/a/d June 4, 1986, River Houze Junior, LLC. (Weisberg, Robert)
May 17, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION to Intervene - MOTION FOR LIMITED INTERVENTION ON BEHALF OF FIFTY PERCENT (50%) OWNERS OF DEFENDANT by River Houze Junior, LLC, Arie Leibovitz Living Trust u/a/d June 4, 1986. (Weisberg, Robert)
May 14, 2021 Filing 19 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Erik Johnson appearing on behalf of River Houze, LLC (Johnson, Erik)
May 14, 2021 Filing 18 REPLY to Response re #3 MOTION to Appoint Receiver and for Preliminary Relief - Expedited Consideration Requested filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, d/b/a Fannie Mae. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Blight Citations) (Uetz, Ann Marie)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER Authorizing Intervention by LivRiverHouze, LLC re #5 MOTION to Intervene OR FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO RECEIVER MOTION Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg)
May 13, 2021 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE:Motion Hearing on 5/13/2021 is Cancelled re #14 Notice of Hearing on Motion, (TMcg)
May 12, 2021 Filing 16 RESPONSE to #3 MOTION to Appoint Receiver and for Preliminary Relief - Expedited Consideration Requested filed by River Houze, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Before and After Pictures, #3 Exhibit B - Before and After Refinance Appraisals, #4 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Gordon Navarre, #5 Exhibit D - Affidavit of Joe Barbat, #6 Exhibit E - Employee Organizational Chart, #7 Exhibit F - Affidavit of John Moran, #8 Exhibit G - Affidavit of Jessica Kadlitz, #9 Exhibit H - Affidavit of Diana Adams, #10 Exhibit I - Affidavit of Tenants, #11 Exhibit J - Loan Statement, #12 Exhibit K - Utilities, #13 Exhibit L - Certificate of Compliance, #14 Exhibit M - Proof of Taxes, #15 Exhibit N - Signed Tax Return, #16 Exhibit O - Proof of Insurance, #17 Exhibit P - April 2 Default Letter, #18 Exhibit Q - April 9 Proof of Liens Bonded Over, #19 Exhibit R - May 5 Default Notice, #20 Exhibit S - Pre-Negotiation Letter) (Lannen, Patrick)
May 6, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF HEARING BY VIDEO CONFERENCE on #3 MOTION to Appoint Receiver and for Preliminary Relief - Expedited Consideration Requested. Motion Hearing set for 5/19/2021 at 3:00 PM before District Judge Gershwin A. Drain |Zoom Webinar Information: https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1604780075?pwd=SEVteWFwMHlmMlhlN2VEeTBPM0VGUT09 Passcode: 058737 Or One tap mobile : US: +16692545252,,1604780075# or +16468287666,,1604780075#| (TMcg)
May 6, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF HEARING BY VIDEO CONFERENCE on #5 MOTION to Intervene OR FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO RECEIVER MOTION. Motion Hearing set for 5/13/2021 at 3:00 PM before District Judge Gershwin A. Drain |Zoom Webinar Information: https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1607225357?pwd=T0JOZ2dPczlsOVJoemVyU0J1VDZ5QT09 Passcode: 449967 Or One tap mobile : US: +16692545252,,1607225357# or +16468287666,,1607225357#| (TMcg)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Regarding May 5, 2021 Status Conference and Setting Briefing Schedule and Hearing Dates #5 MOTION to Intervene OR FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO RECEIVER MOTION filed by LivRiverHouze, LLC., Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings as to #5 MOTION to Intervene OR FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO RECEIVER MOTION :(Response due by 5/10/2021, Reply due by 5/12/2021, Motion Hearing set for 5/13/2021 at 3:00 PM before District Judge Gershwin A. Drain) Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg)
May 6, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #3 MOTION to Appoint Receiver and for Preliminary Relief - Expedited Consideration Requested. Response due by 5/12/2021 Reply due by 5/14/2021 ; Motion Hearing set for 5/19/2021 at 3:00 PM before District Judge Gershwin A. Drain (TMcg)
May 5, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Gershwin A. Drain: Zoom Status Conference held on 5/5/2021 (Court Reporter: Merilyn Jones) (TMcg)
May 4, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick C. Lannen on behalf of River Houze, LLC. (Lannen, Patrick)
May 3, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #10 Order,,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,, by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, d/b/a Fannie Mae (Uetz, Ann Marie)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Setting Status Conference and Other Related Dates re #5 MOTION to Intervene OR FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO RECEIVER MOTION filed by LivRiverHouze, LLC, #1 Complaint,,, filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, d/b/a Fannie Mae, #3 MOTION to Appoint Receiver and for Preliminary Relief - Expedited Consideration Requested filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, d/b/a Fannie Mae., (Serve the Complaint by Monday, May 3, 2021, Proof of Service and Defendant's Appearance due by 5/4/2021, Status Conference set for 5/5/2021 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Gershwin A. Drain) Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg)
April 29, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE by LivRiverHouze, LLC re #5 MOTION to Intervene OR FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO RECEIVER MOTION (NOTICE OF CORRECTION) (Lannen, Patrick)
April 29, 2021 Filing 8 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by LivRiverHouze, LLC (Lannen, Patrick)
April 29, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. River Houze, LLC served on 4/28/2021, answer due 5/19/2021. (McClain, Andrew)
April 29, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew T. McClain on behalf of FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, d/b/a Fannie Mae. (McClain, Andrew)
April 28, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Intervene OR FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO RECEIVER MOTION by LivRiverHouze, LLC. (Lannen, Patrick)
April 27, 2021 Filing 4 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, d/b/a Fannie Mae (Uetz, Ann Marie)
April 27, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Receiver and for Preliminary Relief - Expedited Consideration Requested by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, d/b/a Fannie Mae. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4) (Uetz, Ann Marie)
April 27, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *River Houze, LLC* (TTho)
April 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, d/b/a Fannie Mae against River Houze, LLC. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8442899 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: District of Columbia - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Verification, #3 Exhibit B - Property Description, #4 Exhibit C - Loan Agreement and Note, #5 Exhibit D - Mortgage, #6 Exhibit E - Financing Statements, #7 Exhibit F - Assignments, #8 Exhibit G - State Court Complaint, #9 Exhibit H - Notice of Default) (Uetz, Ann Marie)
April 27, 2021 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (TTho)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, d/b/a Fannie Mae v. River Houze, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, d/b/a Fannie Mae
Represented By: Ann Marie Uetz
Represented By: Andrew T. McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: River Houze, LLC
Represented By: Patrick C. Lannen
Represented By: Erik Johnson
Represented By: Michael F. Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: LivRiverHouze, LLC
Represented By: Patrick C. Lannen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: River Houze Junior, LLC
Represented By: Robert A. Weisberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Arie Leibovitz Living Trust u/a/d June 4, 1986
Represented By: Robert A. Weisberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: Ronald L. Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?