Somona et al v. Wild Wild West Tobacco Wholesale, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Wild Bill's Franchising, LLC and Mazin G. Somona
Defendant: XYZ Companies 1-100 and John Does 1-100
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Wild Wild West Tobacco Wholesale, Inc., Wild Wild West Tobacco Franchise LLC, Wild Wild West Tobacco Inc. and Deniro Saco
Case Number: 2:2021cv11065
Filed: May 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Kimberly G Altman
Referring Judge: Gershwin A Drain
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Counterclaims and Third-Party Complaint re #12 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim, (Response due by 7/30/2021) Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg)
June 24, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Gordon Er Troy on behalf of Deniro Saco, Wild Wild West Tobacco Franchise LLC, Wild Wild West Tobacco Inc., Wild Wild West Tobacco Wholesale, Inc.. (Troy, Gordon)
June 22, 2021 Filing 15 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Wild Wild West Tobacco Wholesale, Inc. (Fuhs, Bernard)
June 22, 2021 Filing 14 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Wild Wild West Tobacco Inc. (Fuhs, Bernard)
June 22, 2021 Filing 13 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Wild Wild West Tobacco Franchise LLC (Fuhs, Bernard)
June 21, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT filed by Deniro Saco, Wild Wild West Tobacco Wholesale, Inc., Wild Wild West Tobacco Inc., Wild Wild West Tobacco Franchise LLC against Wild Bill's Franchising, LLC, Mazin G. Somona, COUNTERCLAIM filed by Deniro Saco, Wild Wild West Tobacco Wholesale, Inc., Wild Wild West Tobacco Inc., Wild Wild West Tobacco Franchise LLC against All Plaintiffs by Deniro Saco, Wild Wild West Tobacco Wholesale, Inc., Wild Wild West Tobacco Inc., Wild Wild West Tobacco Franchise LLC. (Fuhs, Bernard)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATED ORDER Extending time to File Response to #1 Complaint,, Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg)
June 8, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer A. Dukarski on behalf of Deniro Saco, Wild Wild West Tobacco Franchise LLC, Wild Wild West Tobacco Inc., Wild Wild West Tobacco Wholesale, Inc.. (Dukarski, Jennifer)
June 8, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Javon Rachael David on behalf of Deniro Saco, Wild Wild West Tobacco Franchise LLC, Wild Wild West Tobacco Inc., Wild Wild West Tobacco Wholesale, Inc.. (David, Javon)
June 8, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Bernard J. Fuhs on behalf of Deniro Saco, Wild Wild West Tobacco Franchise LLC, Wild Wild West Tobacco Inc., Wild Wild West Tobacco Wholesale, Inc.. (Fuhs, Bernard)
June 1, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Wild Wild West Tobacco Wholesale, Inc. served on 5/14/2021, answer due 6/4/2021. (Wheaton, Jill)
May 25, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Wild Wild West Tobacco Franchise LLC served on 5/17/2021, answer due 6/7/2021. (Wheaton, Jill)
May 25, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Wild Wild West Tobacco Inc. served on 5/17/2021, answer due 6/7/2021. (Wheaton, Jill)
May 25, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Deniro Saco served on 5/17/2021, answer due 6/7/2021. (Wheaton, Jill)
May 11, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (LGra)
May 11, 2021 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
May 10, 2021 Filing 2 Trademark Report Sent To Washington (Wheaton, Jill)
May 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8457574 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Trademark Registrations, #2 Exhibit 2: Examples of Plaintiffs storefronts and web page, #3 Exhibit 3: Examples of Defendants storefronts and web page, #4 Exhibit 4: Correspondence between the parties) (Wheaton, Jill)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Somona et al v. Wild Wild West Tobacco Wholesale, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Wild Wild West Tobacco Wholesale, Inc.
Represented By: Bernard J. Fuhs
Represented By: Gordon Er Troy
Represented By: Javon Rachael David
Represented By: Jennifer A. Dukarski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Wild Wild West Tobacco Franchise LLC
Represented By: Bernard J. Fuhs
Represented By: Gordon Er Troy
Represented By: Javon Rachael David
Represented By: Jennifer A. Dukarski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Wild Wild West Tobacco Inc.
Represented By: Bernard J. Fuhs
Represented By: Gordon Er Troy
Represented By: Javon Rachael David
Represented By: Jennifer A. Dukarski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Deniro Saco
Represented By: Bernard J. Fuhs
Represented By: Gordon Er Troy
Represented By: Javon Rachael David
Represented By: Jennifer A. Dukarski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Companies 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wild Bill's Franchising, LLC
Represented By: Jill M. Wheaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mazin G. Somona
Represented By: Jill M. Wheaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?