Sullivan v. LG Chem Ltd et al
Plaintiff: Michael Sullivan
Defendant: LG Chem Ltd and LG Energy Solution Michigan, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv11137
Filed: May 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Curtis Ivy
Referring Judge: Laurie J Michelson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 REPLY to Response re #3 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by LG Chem Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Choi Supplemental Declaration, #3 Exhibit B - Franklin Capital Funding LLC v Ace Funding Source, #4 Exhibit C - Richter v LG Chem Ltd, #5 Exhibit D - Reyes v Freedom Smokes, #6 Exhibit E - Walsh v LG Chem Limited, #7 Exhibit F - Yamashita v LG Chem Ltd, #8 Exhibit G - Payrovi v LG Chem America Inc, #9 Exhibit H - Death v Mabry, #10 Exhibit I - Macias - Order granting LGC MTD 2021.05.07, #11 Exhibit J - Davis, Fullerton v LG Chem Ltd, #12 Exhibit K - Eriksen v ECX LLC, #13 Exhibit L - Auto-Owners Insurance Company of America v Hallmark Marketing Company) (Hedley, Rachel)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting Defendant LG Chem, Ltd.'s Unopposed #14 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EPar)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 EXHIBIT A re #14 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Unopposed) by LG Chem Ltd (Agosta, Anthony)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Unopposed) by LG Chem Ltd. (Agosta, Anthony)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Staying Deadlines for Rule 26(f) Conference, Rule 26(f) Report, and Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EPar)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION to Stay Deadlines for Rule26(F) Conference, Rule 26(F) Report, and Rule 26(A)(1) Initial Disclosures by All Defendants (Agosta, Anthony)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #10 Response to Motion,,,,, by Michael Sullivan (Mueller, Wolf)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RESPONSE to #3 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Michael Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1-Explosions and Fires in Electronic Cigarettes: Scope and Causes published by the U.S. Fire Administration (USFA) in December of 2014, #3 Exhibit 2-LG Chem, Ltd. v. Amperex Tech. Ltd., No. 2:17-cv-13476, 16, E.D. Mich., filed Oct. 25, 2017, #4 Exhibit 3-Deposition of Joonyoung Shin in Becker v The Vapor Shoppe Inc., #5 Exhibit 4-Black & Decker products sold in Home Depot and Lowes, #6 Exhibit 5-Import data of LG Chem battery shipments, #7 Exhibit 6-Battery warning, #8 Exhibit 7-Szelachowski v. ECX, LLC, Case No. 18-2-13208-8, Kings County, Washington, Order Denying LG Chem Motion to Dismiss, #9 Exhibit 8-Berven v. LG Chem, Ltd., 2019 WL 1746083 (E.D. Calif. April 18, 2019), Order Denying LG Chems Motion to Dismiss, #10 Exhibit 9-Defendant, LG Chems Answer in Scott Becker v. LG Chem, Ltd et al., Case No. 2017-003836-NO, Macomb County Circuit Court, #11 Exhibit 10-Defendant, LG Chems Answer in Roosevelt Emerson, Jr. v. Cloudhunterz, LLC, et al., Case No. 17-016328-NP, Wayne County Circuit Court) (Mueller, Wolf)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Dell P Chappell on behalf of LG Chem Ltd, LG Energy Solution Michigan, Inc.. (Chappell, Dell)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel A. Hedley on behalf of LG Chem Ltd, LG Energy Solution Michigan, Inc.. (Hedley, Rachel)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Scully, Jr on behalf of All Defendants. (Scully, Daniel)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony A. Agosta on behalf of All Defendants. (Agosta, Anthony)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #3 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss by All Defendants (Brown, Jose)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Regarding Determination of #3 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by LG Chem Ltd. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EPar)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss by LG Chem Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 2020.12.22 Sullivan Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2018.11.07 Sullivan Complaint, #4 Exhibit 2021.05.18 Df LGC Notice of Removal and Lee Declaration, #5 Exhibit LG Chem (Mr. Choi) Declaration iso Motion to Dismiss) (Brown, Jose)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER: STRIKING #2 MOTION to Dismiss filed by LG Chem Ltd., for failure to comply with this Court's case management requirements. All briefs filed with the Court shall be in a searchable PDF. As such, it is highly advised to obtain and docket an electronic copy of a document rather than scan in a hardcopy of the document (e.g., printing a brief and then scanning it in is not advised). Issued by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EPar)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 [STRICKEN] MOTION to Dismiss by LG Chem Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 21-115101-NO Complaint from State Court Action, #3 Exhibit 18-111918-NO Complaint from prior State Court Action, #4 Exhibit Notice of Removal and Declaration of Joo Lee, #5 Exhibit Declaration of Kiwon Choi) (Brown, Jose) Modified on 5/27/2021 (EPar).
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (NAhm)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Genesee County Circuit Court, case number 21-115101-NO. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8468470 - Fee: $ 402 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Index of Exhibits, #5 Document Continuation, #6 Document Continuation, #7 Document Continuation, #8 Document Continuation) (Brown, Jose)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sullivan v. LG Chem Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Chem Ltd
Represented By: Jose T. Brown
Represented By: Anthony A. Agosta
Represented By: Daniel J. Scully, Jr.
Represented By: Dell P Chappell
Represented By: Rachel A. Hedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Energy Solution Michigan, Inc.
Represented By: Jose T. Brown
Represented By: Anthony A. Agosta
Represented By: Daniel J. Scully, Jr.
Represented By: Dell P Chappell
Represented By: Rachel A. Hedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Sullivan
Represented By: Wolf Mueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?