Shen v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Cuizhen Shen
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2021cv11519
Filed: June 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Denise Page Hood
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Social Security Administration served on 07-16-21. (Phillips, Randall)
July 14, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald W. Makawa on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. (Makawa, Ronald)
July 13, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney General served on 07/07/21. (Phillips, Randall)
July 13, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security served on 7/7/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (Phillips, Randall)
June 29, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Commissioner of Social Security* (DPer)
June 29, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Referral of Social Security Case to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (DPer)
June 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW filed by Cuizhen Shen against Commissioner of Social Security. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8518111 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Livingston - County Where Action Arose: Livingston - County of 1st Defendant: USA. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Phillips, Randall)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shen v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cuizhen Shen
Represented By: Randall E. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Ronald W. Makawa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?