Continental Casualty Co., as subrogee of Canadian National Railway Company v. David J. Joseph Company
Plaintiff: Continental Casualty Co., as subrogee of Canadian National Railway Company, Chubb Insurance Co. of Canada, as subrogee of Canadian National Railway Company, Lloyd's of London, SGL No. 1, New Line Syndicate 1218, as subrogees of Canadian National Railway Company and RSA Canada, as subrogee of Canadian National Railway Company
Defendant: David J. Joseph Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv11760
Filed: July 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Curtis Ivy
Referring Judge: Linda V Parker
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2021 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #15 Notice of Appearance by All Plaintiffs (Tofilon, Jonathan)
September 10, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Tofilon on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Tofilon, Jonathan)
September 9, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #13 Notice of Appearance by All Plaintiffs (Reid, Kathleen)
September 9, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen A Reid, I on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Reid, Kathleen)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO EXTEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE ( Response due by 10/1/2021, Reply due by 10/15/2021). Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (AFla)
September 9, 2021 Motions terminated: #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (AFla)
September 8, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , #10 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Stay and Compel Arbitration by All Plaintiffs. (Gordon, Brad)
August 27, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Stay and Compel Arbitration by David J. Joseph Company. (Defoe, Bradley)
August 27, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by David J. Joseph Company. (Defoe, Bradley)
August 11, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE by David J. Joseph Company re #6 Order Defendant's Response to Order #6 Regarding Removal (Defoe, Bradley)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATED ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS, ( Responsive pleadings due by 8/28/2021). Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (AFla)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING REMOVAL. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (AFla)
August 6, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #4 Notice of Appearance by All Plaintiffs (Gordon, Brad)
August 6, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Brad Gordon on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Gordon, Brad)
August 5, 2021 Filing 3 STIPULATION To Extend Deadline for Responsive Pleadings by All Defendants (Defoe, Bradley)
August 5, 2021 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll)
August 3, 2021 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Defendant David J. Joseph Company. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #1 Notice of Removal, (Defoe, Bradley)
August 3, 2021 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Defendant Continental Casualty Co., as subrogee of Canadian National Railway Company, Plaintiffs Chubb Insurance Co. of Canada, as subrogee of Canadian National Railway Company, Lloyd's of London, SGL No. 1, New Line Syndicate 1218, as subrogees of Canadian National Railway Company, RSA Canada, as subrogee of Canadian National Railway Company. Reason: Parties were omitted and incorrectly added to CM/ECF (Defoe, Bradley)
August 2, 2021 NOTICE of Error directed to: Bradley S. Defoe re #1 Notice of Removal,. Parties listed on the initiating document were omitted. The filing attorney must use the docket event Addition of Parties to correct the error. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (SOso)
July 30, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE by David J. Joseph Company Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interest (Defoe, Bradley)
July 30, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by David J. Joseph Company from St. Clair County Circuit Court, case number 21-001181-CB. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8559073 - Fee: $ 402 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation State Court Filings) (Defoe, Bradley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Continental Casualty Co., as subrogee of Canadian National Railway Company v. David J. Joseph Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David J. Joseph Company
Represented By: Bradley S. Defoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Continental Casualty Co., as subrogee of Canadian National Railway Company
Represented By: Brad Gordon
Represented By: Jonathan Tofilon
Represented By: Kathleen A Reid, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chubb Insurance Co. of Canada, as subrogee of Canadian National Railway Company
Represented By: Brad Gordon
Represented By: Jonathan Tofilon
Represented By: Kathleen A Reid, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lloyd's of London, SGL No. 1, New Line Syndicate 1218, as subrogees of Canadian National Railway Company
Represented By: Brad Gordon
Represented By: Jonathan Tofilon
Represented By: Kathleen A Reid, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RSA Canada, as subrogee of Canadian National Railway Company
Represented By: Brad Gordon
Represented By: Jonathan Tofilon
Represented By: Kathleen A Reid, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?