Dudley v. Aziyo Biologics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Karrold L. Dudley
Defendant: Aziyo Bilogics, Inc., Medtronic, Inc., Medtronic USA, Inc. and Aziyo Biologics, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv11813
Filed: August 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Gershwin A Drain
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2021 Filing 12 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Aziyo Biologics, Inc. (Bickerdt, Carmen)
September 29, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Carmen M. Bickerdt on behalf of Aziyo Biologics, Inc.. (Bickerdt, Carmen)
September 21, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Aziyo Biologics, Inc. served on 8/18/2021, answer due 9/8/2021. (Segars, Darryl)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to re #1 Complaint,,, (Response due by 10/8/2021) Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg)
September 8, 2021 Filing 8 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Medtronic plc for Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic, Inc.. (Walker, Melanie)
September 8, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie E. Walker on behalf of Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic, Inc.. (Walker, Melanie)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER amending case caption. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (DPer)
August 6, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST for Entry of Prposed Order Amending Caption by All Plaintiffs. (Segars, Darryl)
August 5, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Medtronic USA, Inc.* (DPer)
August 5, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Medtronic, Inc.* (DPer)
August 5, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Aziyo Bilogics, Inc.* (DPer)
August 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8566426 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation) (Segars, Darryl)
August 5, 2021 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DPer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dudley v. Aziyo Biologics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karrold L. Dudley
Represented By: Darryl Keenan Segars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aziyo Bilogics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtronic, Inc.
Represented By: Melanie E. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtronic USA, Inc.
Represented By: Melanie E. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aziyo Biologics, Inc.
Represented By: Carmen M. Bickerdt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?