Canadian National Railway Company et al v. THE DAVID J. JOSEPH COMPANY
Plaintiff: Canadian National Railway Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London Subscribing to Policy Nos.1814950, 1814958, 1814959, 1814960, 1814961, 1814963, 1814973, AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP UK LIMITED, f/k/a/ AIG EUROPE LIMITED, AXA XL, f/k/a XL INSURANCE COMPANY OF CANADA, ROYAL & SUN ALLIANCE INSURANCE COMPANY OF CANADA, STARR INSURANCE & REINSURANCE LIMITED, HDI SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, ASSICURAZIONI GENERALI S.p.A., IRONSHORE INSURANCE LTD., OIL CASUALTY INSURANCE, LTD., as Subrogees of Canadian National Railway Company, American International Group UK Limited, AXA XL, AIG Europe Limited, XL Insurance Company of Canada and Oil Casualty Insurance, Ltd.
Defendant: THE DAVID J. JOSEPH COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2021cv11931
Filed: August 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Curtis Ivy
2 Judge: David M Lawson
3 Judge: Linda V Parker
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2021 Filing 13 REPLY to Response re #9 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Stay and Compel Arbitration filed by THE DAVID J. JOSEPH COMPANY. (Defoe, Bradley)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATED ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND/OR STAY AND COMPEL ARBITRATION ( Reply due by 10/15/2021) Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (AFla)
September 10, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #9 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Stay and Compel Arbitration filed by ASSICURAZIONI GENERALI S.p.A., IRONSHORE INSURANCE LTD., AXA XL, American International Group UK Limited, Canadian National Railway Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London Subscribing to Policy Nos.1814950, 1814958, 1814959, 1814960, 1814961, 1814963, 1814973, HDI SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, Oil Casualty Insurance, Ltd., ROYAL & SUN ALLIANCE INSURANCE COMPANY OF CANADA, STARR INSURANCE & REINSURANCE LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit DJJ with Kelly signature - Contract CN564596 Upside) (Schaedig, Christopher)
August 30, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #6 Order by THE DAVID J. JOSEPH COMPANY. (Defoe, Bradley)
August 27, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Stay and Compel Arbitration by THE DAVID J. JOSEPH COMPANY. (Defoe, Bradley)
August 27, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE by THE DAVID J. JOSEPH COMPANY of Motion to Consolidate (Defoe, Bradley)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATED ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings as to ( Responsive Pleading due by 9/17/2021). Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (AFla)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING REMOVAL. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (AFla)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge David M. Lawson and Magistrate Judge David R. Grand to District Judge Linda V. Parker and Magistrate Judge Curtis Ivy, Jr. (SSch)
August 24, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by THE DAVID J. JOSEPH COMPANY re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Filing Lower Court Original Summons and Complaint (Defoe, Bradley)
August 20, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher R. Schaedig on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Schaedig, Christopher)
August 20, 2021 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DPer)
August 19, 2021 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by THE DAVID J. JOSEPH COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent Nucor Corporation for THE DAVID J. JOSEPH COMPANY. (Defoe, Bradley)
August 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by THE DAVID J. JOSEPH COMPANY from 31st Judicial Circuit Court, case number 21-001180-CB. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8584832 - Fee: $ 402 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Defoe, Bradley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Canadian National Railway Company et al v. THE DAVID J. JOSEPH COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Canadian National Railway Company
Represented By: Bruce N. Moss
Represented By: Christopher R. Schaedig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London Subscribing to Policy Nos.1814950, 1814958, 1814959, 1814960, 1814961, 1814963, 1814973
Represented By: Bruce N. Moss
Represented By: Christopher R. Schaedig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP UK LIMITED, f/k/a/ AIG EUROPE LIMITED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AXA XL, f/k/a XL INSURANCE COMPANY OF CANADA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROYAL & SUN ALLIANCE INSURANCE COMPANY OF CANADA
Represented By: Bruce N. Moss
Represented By: Christopher R. Schaedig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STARR INSURANCE & REINSURANCE LIMITED
Represented By: Bruce N. Moss
Represented By: Christopher R. Schaedig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HDI SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Bruce N. Moss
Represented By: Christopher R. Schaedig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASSICURAZIONI GENERALI S.p.A., IRONSHORE INSURANCE LTD.
Represented By: Bruce N. Moss
Represented By: Christopher R. Schaedig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OIL CASUALTY INSURANCE, LTD., as Subrogees of Canadian National Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American International Group UK Limited
Represented By: Bruce N. Moss
Represented By: Christopher R. Schaedig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AXA XL
Represented By: Bruce N. Moss
Represented By: Christopher R. Schaedig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AIG Europe Limited
Represented By: Bruce N. Moss
Represented By: Christopher R. Schaedig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XL Insurance Company of Canada
Represented By: Bruce N. Moss
Represented By: Christopher R. Schaedig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oil Casualty Insurance, Ltd.
Represented By: Bruce N. Moss
Represented By: Christopher R. Schaedig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE DAVID J. JOSEPH COMPANY
Represented By: Bradley S. Defoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?