State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company v. Hakki, M.D. et al
Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Defendant: Sam Hakki, M.D., Nabil Beydoun, Abdul Beydoun, Fouad Beydoun, Sam Hackette, Star Pain Management & Rehabilitation LLC, Advanced Central Laboratory, LLC, Midwest Medical Lab LLC, Future Diagnostic Center LLC, Nabil Baydoun, Bill Baydoun, Abdul Baydoun, Abe Baydoun, Fouad Baydoun, Frank Baydoun, Anwar Baker, Mohamed El-Fakharany, M.D., Riad George Khoury, M.D., Vinod Sharma, M.D., Horst Griesser, M.D., Muna Afan and NextGen Pain Associates & Rehabilitation LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv11940
Filed: August 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Denise Page Hood
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2021 Filing 22 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Gary R. Blumberg appearing on behalf of Riad George Khoury, M.D. Co-Counsel (Blumberg, Gary)
October 18, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter W. Joelson on behalf of Riad George Khoury, M.D.. (Joelson, Peter)
October 15, 2021 Filing 20 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Gary R. Blumberg appearing on behalf of Sam Hakki, M.D. Co-Counsel (Blumberg, Gary)
October 15, 2021 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Vinod Sharma, M.D.. (Piraino, Robert)
October 15, 2021 Filing 18 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Robert Alex Piraino appearing on behalf of Vinod Sharma, M.D. (Piraino, Robert)
October 14, 2021 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Vinod Sharma, M.D. served on 9/24/2021, answer due 10/15/2021. (Giordano, Caroline)
October 14, 2021 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Mohamed El-Fakharany, M.D. served on 9/13/2021, answer due 10/4/2021. (Giordano, Caroline)
October 14, 2021 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Advanced Central Laboratory, LLC served on 9/24/2021, answer due 10/15/2021. (Giordano, Caroline)
September 28, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter W. Joelson on behalf of Sam Hakki, M.D.. (Joelson, Peter)
September 23, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Sam Hakki, M.D. waiver sent on 9/9/2021, answer due 11/8/2021. (Giordano, Caroline)
September 13, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Horst Griesser, M.D. waiver sent on 9/3/2021, answer due 11/2/2021. (Giordano, Caroline)
September 13, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Midwest Medical Lab LLC waiver sent on 9/3/2021, answer due 11/2/2021. (Giordano, Caroline)
September 13, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Fouad Beydoun waiver sent on 9/2/2021, answer due 11/1/2021. (Giordano, Caroline)
September 13, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Nabil Beydoun waiver sent on 9/2/2021, answer due 11/1/2021. (Giordano, Caroline)
September 13, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Star Pain Management & Rehabilitation LLC waiver sent on 9/3/2021, answer due 11/2/2021. (Giordano, Caroline)
August 23, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued for *Advanced Central Laboratory, LLC, Muna Afan, Anwar Baker, Abdul Beydoun, Fouad Beydoun, Nabil Beydoun, Mohamed El-Fakharany, M.D., Future Diagnostic Center LLC, Horst Griesser, M.D., Sam Hakki, M.D., Riad George Khoury, M.D., Midwest Medical Lab LLC, NextGen Pain Associates & Rehabilitation LLC, Vinod Sharma, M.D., Star Pain Management & Rehabilitation LLC* (SKra)
August 20, 2021 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Eric T. Gortner appearing on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Gortner, Eric)
August 20, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Ross O. Silverman appearing on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Silverman, Ross)
August 20, 2021 Filing 4 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Giordano, Caroline)
August 20, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew P. Allen on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Allen, Matthew)
August 20, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas W. Cranmer on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Cranmer, Thomas)
August 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8585642 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Macomb. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1. Advanced Central Laboratory RICO Events, #3 Exhibit 2. Midwest Medical Lab RICO Events, #4 Exhibit 3. Future Diagnostic Center RICO Events, #5 Exhibit 4. Requisition Forms for Patient A.J., #6 Exhibit 5. Laboratory Services Agreement ACL and MML, #7 Exhibit 6. MMLs CLIA Application for Certification, Apr. 12, 2018, #8 Exhibit 7. Letter from Ohio Department of Health to MML, Apr. 30, 2018, #9 Exhibit 8. Future Diagnostic Center Statement of Deficiencies and Plan of Correction, Mar. 5, 2020, #10 Exhibit 9. LARA Deficiency Letter to Future Diagnostic Center, Mar. 10, 2020, #11 Exhibit 10. Letters from LARA to Future Diagnostic Center Noting Corrections Not Made, #12 Exhibit 11. Riad Khoury Mar. 28, 2019 Deposition Transcript Excerpts, #13 Exhibit 12. Examples of UDT Reports with Physiologically Impossible Results, #14 Exhibit 13. Patient S.J. Records, #15 Exhibit 14. Patient A.H. Records, #16 Exhibit 15. Patient S.H. Records, #17 Exhibit 16. Patient L.E. Records, #18 Exhibit 17. Patient A.J. Records) (Giordano, Caroline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company v. Hakki, M.D. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Hakki, M.D.
Represented By: Gary R. Blumberg
Represented By: Peter W. Joelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nabil Beydoun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abdul Beydoun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fouad Beydoun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Hackette
Represented By: Gary R. Blumberg
Represented By: Peter W. Joelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Star Pain Management & Rehabilitation LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Central Laboratory, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Medical Lab LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Future Diagnostic Center LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nabil Baydoun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Baydoun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abdul Baydoun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abe Baydoun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fouad Baydoun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Baydoun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anwar Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohamed El-Fakharany, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riad George Khoury, M.D.
Represented By: Gary R. Blumberg
Represented By: Peter W. Joelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vinod Sharma, M.D.
Represented By: Robert Alex Piraino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horst Griesser, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Muna Afan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NextGen Pain Associates & Rehabilitation LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Eric T. Gortner
Represented By: Matthew P. Allen
Represented By: Ross O. Silverman
Represented By: Thomas W. Cranmer
Represented By: Caroline B. Giordano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?