Outlaw Performance Boats, LLP et al v. Brown & Brown of Florida, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Outlaw Performance Boats, LLP, Larry Lalewicz and Leslie Lalewicz
Defendant: Brown & Brown of Florida, Inc. d/b/a Marine Insurance, Reed Hendrix and Brown & Brown of Florida, Inc. Doing business as Marine Insurance
Case Number: 2:2021cv11961
Filed: August 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Kimberly G Altman
Referring Judge: Gershwin A Drain
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2021 Filing 12 REPLY to Response re #10 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint or Transfer Venue filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Bodwin, Theresa)
October 1, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #10 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint or Transfer Venue filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E) (Kaszubski, Marc)
September 20, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint or Transfer Venue by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Ex. A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit Ex. B - Declaration of Michael Gorham, #4 Exhibit Ex. C - Declaration of Reed Hendrix, #5 Exhibit Ex. D - Policy Application) (Bodwin, Theresa)
September 20, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Theresa Bodwin on behalf of Reed Hendrix. (Bodwin, Theresa)
September 20, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by James C. Wright on behalf of Reed Hendrix. (Wright, James)
September 17, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Theresa Bodwin on behalf of Brown & Brown of Florida, Inc.. (Bodwin, Theresa)
September 17, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by James C. Wright on behalf of Brown & Brown of Florida, Inc.. (Wright, James)
August 24, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence M. Scott on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Scott, Lawrence)
August 24, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian C. Grant on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Grant, Brian)
August 24, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Reed Hendrix* (DPer)
August 24, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Brown & Brown of Florida, Inc.* (DPer)
August 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8589025 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: St. Clair County - County Where Action Arose: St. Clair County - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Kaszubski, Marc)
August 24, 2021 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DPer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Outlaw Performance Boats, LLP et al v. Brown & Brown of Florida, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Outlaw Performance Boats, LLP
Represented By: Brian C. Grant
Represented By: Lawrence M. Scott
Represented By: Marc D. Kaszubski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Lalewicz
Represented By: Brian C. Grant
Represented By: Lawrence M. Scott
Represented By: Marc D. Kaszubski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Lalewicz
Represented By: Brian C. Grant
Represented By: Lawrence M. Scott
Represented By: Marc D. Kaszubski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown & Brown of Florida, Inc. d/b/a Marine Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reed Hendrix
Represented By: James C. Wright
Represented By: Theresa Bodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown & Brown of Florida, Inc. Doing business as Marine Insurance
Represented By: James C. Wright
Represented By: Theresa Bodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?