Montoya v. Capital One, N.A.
Plaintiff: Kimani Montoya
Defendant: Capital One, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2021cv11978
Filed: August 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Kimberly G Altman
Referring Judge: Sean F Cox
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Kimani Montoya to Show Cause why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Show Cause Response due by 11/16/2021 Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
October 20, 2021 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #5 Order to Show Cause on Kimani Montoya at 6263 N. McKinley Road, Flushing, MI 48433-1166 (JMcC)
September 27, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Capital One, N.A.* (NAhm)
September 21, 2021 Filing 3 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas)
August 30, 2021 FILING FEE Received in the amount of 402.00 by Kimani Montoya - Receipt No. DET137155 [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (RBog)
August 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Kimani Montoya against Capital One, N.A. (DPer)
August 25, 2021 Deficiency directed to Kimani Montoya: Initiating document filed without any form of payment or Application for In Forma Pauperis. (DPer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montoya v. Capital One, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimani Montoya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?