Kozole v. Suman et al
Plaintiff: Rick Kozole
Defendant: Andrew Suman, Flow Coatings, LLC, Line2Line, Inc., Commodo Materials, LLC and Catherine Suman
Case Number: 2:2021cv12034
Filed: September 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Laurie J Michelson
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2021 Minute Entry for telephonic proceedings before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson: The Court held a Preliminary Telephonic Scheduling Conference on 10/28/2021. The parties are going to exchange initial disclosures and pursue early facilitation. If the case does not resolve in facilitation, the Court will then set a Scheduling Conference. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (EPar)
October 25, 2021 Filing 20 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Watson, Linda)
October 19, 2021 RESET Hearing: **DATE AND TIME CHANGE** TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference reset for 10/28/2021 at 03:00 PM before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EPar)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER TO ATTEND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS FOR SUBMISSION OF DISCOVERY PLAN. (TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference set for 10/25/2021 at 11:00 AM before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson) Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EPar)
October 7, 2021 Filing 18 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Rick Kozole. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Watson, Linda)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER: The order to show cause is hereby SATISFIED pursuant to #18 Plaintiff's Response to Order to Show Cause. Issued by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EPar)
September 28, 2021 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses , Jury Reliance and Certificate of Service by Flow Coatings, LLC, Line2Line, Inc., Andrew Suman. (Beadle, Thomas)
September 28, 2021 Filing 16 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Line2Line, Inc. (Beadle, Thomas)
September 28, 2021 Filing 15 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Flow Coatings, LLC (Beadle, Thomas)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER to Show Cause. Show Cause Response due by 10/7/2021 Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EPar)
September 23, 2021 Filing 13 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Commodo Materials, LLC (Beadle, Thomas)
September 23, 2021 NOTICE of Error directed to: Thomas L. Beadle re 12 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations. The document contains fillable fields. Document must be flattened with no fillable fields. Document was stricken and must be refiled correctly.. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (TTho)
September 22, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand Reliance and Certificate of Service by Commodo Materials, LLC, Catherine Suman. (Beadle, Thomas)
September 20, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas L. Beadle on behalf of All Defendants. (Beadle, Thomas)
September 10, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Commodo Materials, LLC served on 9/3/2021, answer due 9/24/2021. (Alfs, John)
September 10, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Catherine Suman served on 9/3/2021, answer due 9/24/2021. (Alfs, John)
September 10, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Line2Line, Inc. served on 9/8/2021, answer due 9/29/2021. (Alfs, John)
September 10, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Andrew Suman served on 9/8/2021, answer due 9/29/2021. (Alfs, John)
September 10, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Flow Coatings, LLC served on 9/8/2021, answer due 9/29/2021. (Alfs, John)
September 10, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Rick Kozole served on 9/8/2021, answer due 9/29/2021. (Alfs, John) [CERTIFICATE IS FOR DEFENDANT ANDREW SUMAN]Modified on 9/10/2021 (EPar).
September 10, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by John B. Alfs on behalf of Rick Kozole. (Alfs, John)
September 1, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (DPer)
September 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial filed by Rick Kozole against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8601631 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Watson, Linda)
September 1, 2021 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DPer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kozole v. Suman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Kozole
Represented By: Linda M. Watson
Represented By: John B. Alfs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Suman
Represented By: Thomas L. Beadle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flow Coatings, LLC
Represented By: Thomas L. Beadle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Line2Line, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas L. Beadle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commodo Materials, LLC
Represented By: Thomas L. Beadle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Suman
Represented By: Thomas L. Beadle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?