Trinklein v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Thomas Trinklein
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2021cv12096
Filed: September 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Terrence G Berg
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Social Security: HIA
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney on behalf of Thomas Trinklein served on 9/13/2021, answer due 11/12/2021. (Versical, Bethany)
September 15, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael L. Henry on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. (Henry, Michael)
September 9, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Commissioner of Social Security* (SOso)
September 9, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Referral of Social Security Case to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (SOso)
September 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Thomas Trinklein against Commissioner of Social Security. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8608461 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Saginaw - County Where Action Arose: Genesee - County of 1st Defendant: USA. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Versical, Bethany)
September 9, 2021 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SOso)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trinklein v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Trinklein
Represented By: Bethany G. Versical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Michael L. Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?