Holland v. Fouts
Plaintiff: Cory Holland, Sr.
Defendant: James Fouts
Case Number: 2:2021cv12265
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Laurie J Michelson
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Lease, #4 Exhibit Complaint for Possession, #5 Exhibit Judgment of Possession, #6 Exhibit MCCC Opinion & Order, #7 Exhibit Kunde v. City of Indep. Ohio, #8 Exhibit Mills v County of Lapeer COA, #9 Exhibit Mills v County of Lapeer ED Mich) (Badalamenti, Raechel)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 U.S. Marshal Documents Lost by Post Office, by Cory Holland, Sr. (RLou)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed as to James Fouts. (date of receipt not specified) (DPer)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EPar)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #10 Order Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge on Cory Holland, Sr mailed to 8467 Republic Ave., Warren, MI 48089. (EPar)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #7 Attorney Appearance by All Defendants (Badalamenti, Raechel)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Raechel M. Badalamenti appearing on behalf of All Defendants (Badalamenti, Raechel)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT from U.S. Marshal Service of Receipt of Service of Process Documents. (DPer)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Complete Service Documents and for Service of Process by the US Marshal. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EPar)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #6 Directing Service by the US Marshal on Cory Holland, Sr mailed to Cory Holland, Sr. at 8467 Republic Ave., Warren, MI 48089. (EPar)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for *James Fouts* (RLou)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs and granting request for service by the U.S. Marshal. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EPar)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #4 Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs on Cory Holland, Sr at 8467 Republic Ave., Warren, MI 48089. (EPar)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 APPLICATION to proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Cory Holland, Sr. (DPer)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Cory Holland, Sr against James Fouts (DPer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holland v. Fouts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cory Holland, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Fouts
Represented By: Raechel M. Badalamenti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?