Saab v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Hussein Diab Saab
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv12291
Filed: September 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Curtis Ivy
Referring Judge: David M Lawson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE by Hussein Diab Saab (Makled, Daniel) Modified on 11/24/2021 (SKra).[WRONG EVENT USED-JURY DEMAND]
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Interim Status Conference set for 4/6/2022 at 4:00 PM; Discovery due by 5/31/2022; Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 6/17/2022; Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/15/2023 at 4:00 PM; Bench Trial set for 2/28/2023 at 8:30 AM before District Judge David M. Lawson. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (Refer to image for additional dates) (SPin)
November 15, 2021 Minute Entry for telephonic proceedings before District Judge David M. Lawson: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 11/15/2021. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (SPin)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ONLY ORDER Granting #13 Motion To Excuse Local Counsel from Conference. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin)
November 10, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION , Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Excuse Defendant's Local Counsel from Case Management Status and Scheduling Conference by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Herring, Jacqueline)
November 10, 2021 Filing 12 STIPULATION to Excuse Defendant's Local Counsel from Case Management Status and Scheduling Conference by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Herring, Jacqueline)
November 10, 2021 Set Deadlines/Hearings: TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference reset for 11/15/2021 at 3:00 PM before District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin)
November 8, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Hussein Diab Saab. (Makled, Daniel)
November 5, 2021 Filing 10 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Herring, Jacqueline)
November 4, 2021 Set Deadlines/Hearings: TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference reset for 11/16/2021 at 9:00 AM (TIME CHANGE ONLY) before District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin)
October 20, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John M. Boyda on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Boyda, John)
October 19, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Scheduling Conference set for 11/16/2021 at 11:30 AM before District Judge David M. Lawson. See image for document deadline. (SPin)
October 15, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Hussein Diab Saab. (Makled, Daniel)
October 13, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #4 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Hussein Diab Saab. (Makled, Daniel)
October 13, 2021 NOTICE of Error directed to: Daniel B Makled re #5 Answer to Counterclaim. Wrong or incomplete PDF image was uploaded. Document was stricken and must be refiled correctly. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (LHos)
October 11, 2021 Filing 5 [STRICKEN] ANSWER to Counterclaim with Affirmative Defenses by Hussein Diab Saab. (Makled, Daniel) Modified on 10/13/2021 (LHos).
October 5, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses , Metropolitan Life Insurance Company's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company against Hussein Diab Saab by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Herring, Jacqueline)
September 29, 2021 Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent MetLife, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Herring, Jacqueline)
September 29, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline J Herring on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Herring, Jacqueline)
September 29, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company from Circuit Court for the Third Judicial Circuit, Wayne County, MI, case number 21-010981-CK. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8633525 - Fee: $ 402 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Summons, #3 Exhibit 2 - Complaint, #4 Exhibit 3 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (Herring, Jacqueline)
September 29, 2021 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DPer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saab v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hussein Diab Saab
Represented By: Daniel B Makled
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Jacqueline J Herring
Represented By: John M. Boyda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?