McGlynn v. Bahri et al
Plaintiff: David McGlynn
Defendant: Roxanne Jajo Bahri Doing business as All About The Real Housewives, Lara Sophia, Does 1 -10 inclusive and Lara Sophia Delengowski
Case Number: 2:2021cv12295
Filed: September 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Kimberly G Altman
Referring Judge: Mark A Goldsmith
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2021 Filing 17 Copyright Report Sent To Washington (SSch)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER OF DISMISSAL Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (KSan)
November 17, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by David McGlynn with Prejudice Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) (Leath, Jayma)
November 8, 2021 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Lara Sophia Delengowski served on 11/5/2021, answer due 11/26/2021. (SSch)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion to terminate Lara Sophia as a party and correct the docket as to the termination (Dkt. 12). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (TTho)
October 18, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Substitute Party Lara Sophia with Lara Sophia Delengowski by David McGlynn. (Leath, Jayma)
October 18, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Issued for *Lara Sophia Delengowski* (LHos)
October 18, 2021 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by David McGlynn against Roxanne Jajo Bahri, Does 1 -10 inclusive, Lara Sophia, Lara Sophia Delengowski. NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Leath, Jayma)
October 18, 2021 REQUEST for SUMMONS for Lara Sophia Delengowski. (Leath, Jayma)
October 15, 2021 NOTICE of Error directed to: Jayma Christine Leath re #9 Amended Complaint,. Parties listed on the initiating document were omitted. The filing attorney must use the docket event Addition of Parties to correct the error. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (LHos)
October 14, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Correcting a party's name from Lara Sophia to Lara Sophia Delengowski filed by David McGlynn against Roxanne Jajo Bahri, Does 1 -10 inclusive, Lara Sophia. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Leath, Jayma)
October 13, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued for *Lara Sophia* (LHos)
October 11, 2021 REQUEST for SUMMONS for Lara Sophia. (Leath, Jayma)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Regarding Certification Requirements. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (KSan)
September 29, 2021 Filing 6 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by David McGlynn (Leath, Jayma)
September 29, 2021 Filing 5 Copyright Report Sent To Washington (Leath, Jayma)
September 29, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Does 1 -10 inclusive* (DPer)
September 29, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Lara Sophia* (DPer)
September 29, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Roxanne Jajo Bahri* (DPer)
September 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by David McGlynn against Does 1 -10 inclusive, Roxanne Jajo Bahri d/b/a All About The Real Housewives, Lara Sophia with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8634230 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: New York - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Leath, Jayma)
September 29, 2021 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DPer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGlynn v. Bahri et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David McGlynn
Represented By: Jayma Christine Leath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roxanne Jajo Bahri Doing business as All About The Real Housewives
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lara Sophia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 -10 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lara Sophia Delengowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?