Adams v. Ford Motor Company, et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Adams, Jr.
Defendant: UAW International Union and Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv12472
Filed: October 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Mark A Goldsmith
Referring Judge: Denise Page Hood
2 Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2021 Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before District Judge Denise Page Hood: Motion Hearing held on 12/14/2021 re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by UAW International Union Disposition: Motion taken under advisement (Court Reporter: Sheri Ward) (LSau)
December 6, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - 2017 Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 - 2018 Order, #4 Exhibit 3 - 2018 Judgment, #5 Exhibit 4 - Sixth Circuit Order, #6 Exhibit 5 - 11-16-21 Mailing) (Bohannon, Ryan)
November 29, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan D. Bohannon on behalf of Ford Motor Company. (Bohannon, Ryan)
November 22, 2021 Filing 8 REPLY to Response re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by UAW International Union. (Canzano, John)
November 22, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Phillip M. Keller on behalf of UAW International Union. (Keller, Phillip)
November 4, 2021 Filing 6 RESPONSE to #4 Motion to dismiss filed by Joseph Adams, Jr. (DPer)
November 4, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF IN PERSON HEARING on #4 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2021 03:30 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
November 4, 2021 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #5 Notice of Hearing on Motion on Joseph Adams, Jr at 8202 Inkster Rd., Dearborn Heights, MI 48127. (LSau)
October 28, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by UAW International Union. (Canzano, John)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith to District Judge Denise Page Hood. (NAhm)
October 22, 2021 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DPer)
October 21, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE by UAW International Union re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Filing Notice of Removal (Canzano, John)
October 21, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by UAW International Union from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 21-012398-CZ. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8662548 - Fee: $ 402 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan, 17-cv-13042, Judge Denise Page Hood] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 2, #2 Exhibit Ex 3) (Canzano, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. Ford Motor Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UAW International Union
Represented By: John R. Canzano
Represented By: Phillip M. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Ryan D. Bohannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Adams, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?