Tripp v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Raven Cantu, RRKC and Amy Tripp
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2021cv12859
Filed: December 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Curtis Ivy
Referring Judge: Patricia T Morris
2 Judge: Victoria A Roberts
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. US Dept of Health and Human Services served on 01/11/2022. (Olsman, Jules)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Dept of Health and Human Services served on 01/11/2022. (Olsman, Jules)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney on behalf of All Defendants. (Olsman, Jules)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney on behalf of All Defendants. (Olsman, Jules)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney on behalf of United States of America served on 12/23/2021, answer due 2/22/2022. (Olsman, Jules)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney on behalf of United States of America served on 12/13/2021, answer due 2/11/2022. (Olsman, Jules)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Issued for for the United States Attorney and the Office of the Attorney General. (SSch)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued for *United States of America* (SSch)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Seal. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (SSch) (Main Document 7 replaced on 12/15/2021) (SSch).
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Ex Parte MOTION to Seal Previously Filed Complaint by All Plaintiffs. (Olsman, Jules)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Affidavit of Merit filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Olsman, Jules)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Error directed to: Jules B. Olsman re #1 Complaint,,. Parties listed on the initiating document were omitted. The filing attorney must use the docket event Addition of Parties to correct the error. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (NAhm)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs Raven Cantu, Amy Tripp. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF (Olsman, Jules)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 [SEALED per 12/15/21 Order] SUMMONS Issued for the United States Attorney and the Office of the Attorney General. (NAhm) Modified on 12/15/2021 (SSch).
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 [SEALED per 12/15/21 Order]SUMMONS Issued for *United States of America* (NAhm) Modified on 12/15/2021 (SSch).
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 [SEALED per 12/15/21 Order] COMPLAINT and Affidavit of Merit filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8716217 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Genesee - County Where Action Arose: Saginaw - County of 1st Defendant: USA. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits) (Olsman, Jules) Modified on 12/15/2021 (SSch).
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (NAhm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tripp v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raven Cantu
Represented By: Jules B. Olsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RRKC
Represented By: Jules B. Olsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Tripp
Represented By: Jules B. Olsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?