Doe, M.D. v. The Board of Regents of the University of Michigan et al
Plaintiff: John Doe, M.D.
Defendant: The Board of Regents of the University of Michigan, Marie Lozon, M.D. and Justin Dimick, M.D.
Petitioner: Charles Blackwell
Case Number: 2:2021cv13032
Filed: December 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Gershwin A Drain
Referring Judge: Nancy G Edmunds
2 Judge: Curtis Ivy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2022 Filing 43 REPLY to Response re #38 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by John Doe, M.D.. (Acho, Ronald)
February 4, 2022 Filing 42 RESPONSE to #38 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, Medical Staff Bylaws, #3 Exhibit B, Rules and Regulations, #4 Exhibit C, University Bylaws) (French, David)
February 3, 2022 Filing 41 REPLY to Response re #29 MOTION Protective Order for Permission to Proceed Pseudonymously or in the Alternative, For Leave to Amend the Complaint filed by John Doe, M.D.. (Kasmikha, Saif)
February 1, 2022 Filing 40 REPLY to Response re #14 MOTION to Dismiss The Board of Regents of University of Michigan filed by The Board of Regents of the University of Michigan. (French, David)
February 1, 2022 Filing 39 REPLY to Response re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Marie Lozon, MD and Justin Dimick, MD filed by Justin Dimick, M.D., Marie Lozon, M.D.. (French, David)
January 28, 2022 Filing 38 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by John Doe, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Proposed First Amended Complaint) (Acho, Ronald)
January 27, 2022 Filing 37 RESPONSE to #29 MOTION Protective Order for Permission to Proceed Pseudonymously or in the Alternative, For Leave to Amend the Complaint filed by All Defendants. (Rabin, Jonathon)
January 25, 2022 Filing 36 MOTION to Seal Affidavit by John Doe, M.D.. (Acho, Ronald)
January 25, 2022 Filing 35 RESPONSE to #15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by John Doe, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A; Affidavit (Redacted)) (Acho, Ronald)
January 25, 2022 Filing 34 RESPONSE to #14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by John Doe, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Affidavit (Redacted)) (Acho, Ronald)
January 19, 2022 Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply to Movant Charles Blackwells Reply to Defendants Response to Movants Motion To Intervene And Unseal Judicial Records by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Proposed Surreply Brief) (Rabin, Jonathon)
January 18, 2022 Filing 32 REPLY to Plaintiff #30 Response to Movant #8 MOTION to Intervene and Unseal Judicial Records, filed by Charles Blackwell. (RLou)
January 18, 2022 Filing 31 REPLY to Defendants' #27 Response to Movant #8 MOTION to Intervene and Unseal Judicial Records, filed by Charles Blackwell. (RLou)
January 17, 2022 Filing 30 RESPONSE to #8 MOTION to Intervene and Unseal Judicial Records filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Kasmikha, Saif)
January 17, 2022 Filing 29 MOTION Protective Order for Permission to Proceed Pseudonymously or in the Alternative, For Leave to Amend the Complaint by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Kasmikha, Saif)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Why A Preliminary Injunction Should Not Be Issued filed by John Doe, M.D. ; and Setting Briefing Schedule. ***SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS*** Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg)
January 14, 2022 Filing 27 RESPONSE to #8 MOTION to Intervene and Unseal filed by All Defendants. (Rabin, Jonathon)
January 7, 2022 Filing 26 SEALED EXHIBIT L re #16 MOTION to Seal by All Defendants. (Rabin, Jonathon)
January 7, 2022 Filing 25 SEALED EXHIBIT K re #16 MOTION to Seal by All Defendants. (Rabin, Jonathon)
January 7, 2022 Filing 24 SEALED EXHIBIT J re #16 MOTION to Seal by All Defendants. (Rabin, Jonathon)
January 7, 2022 Filing 23 SEALED EXHIBIT I re #16 MOTION to Seal by All Defendants. (Rabin, Jonathon)
January 7, 2022 Filing 22 SEALED EXHIBIT H re #16 MOTION to Seal by All Defendants. (Rabin, Jonathon)
January 7, 2022 Filing 21 SEALED EXHIBIT G re #16 MOTION to Seal by All Defendants. (Rabin, Jonathon)
January 7, 2022 Filing 20 SEALED EXHIBIT F re #16 MOTION to Seal by All Defendants. (Rabin, Jonathon)
January 7, 2022 Filing 19 SEALED EXHIBIT E re #16 MOTION to Seal by All Defendants. (Rabin, Jonathon)
January 7, 2022 Filing 18 SEALED EXHIBIT D re #16 MOTION to Seal by All Defendants. (Rabin, Jonathon)
January 7, 2022 Filing 17 SEALED EXHIBIT C re #16 MOTION to Seal by All Defendants. (Rabin, Jonathon)
January 7, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION to Seal by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, Redacted Copy of Individual Defs' Response to Plaintiff's Motion, #3 Index of Exhibits B, Redacted Copy of Regents' Response to Plaintiff's Motion, #4 Exhibit C, Blank Page for Sealed Copy of Individual Defs' Response to Motion, #5 Exhibit D, Blank Page for Sealed Copy of Regents' Response to Motion, #6 Exhibit E, Blank Page for Ex. 3 to Response Briefs, #7 Exhibit F, Blank Page for Ex. 4 to Response Briefs, #8 Exhibit G, Blank Page for Ex. 5 to Response Briefs, #9 Exhibit H, Blank Page for Ex. 6 to Response Briefs, #10 Exhibit I, Blank Page for Ex. 7 to Response Briefs, #11 Exhibit J, Blank Page for Ex. 8 to Response Briefs, #12 Exhibit K, Blank Page for Ex. 9 to Response Briefs, #13 Exhibit L, Blank Page for Ex. 10 to Response Briefs) (Rabin, Jonathon)
January 4, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by Justin Dimick, M.D., Marie Lozon, M.D.. (French, David)
January 4, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss by The Board of Regents of the University of Michigan. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, Medical Staff Bylaws, #3 Exhibit B, Rules and Regulations) (French, David)
January 4, 2022 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Larry R. Jensen, Jr appearing on behalf of All Defendants (Jensen, Larry)
January 4, 2022 Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jonathon A. Rabin appearing on behalf of All Defendants (Rabin, Jonathon)
January 4, 2022 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: David A. French appearing on behalf of All Defendants (French, David)
January 3, 2022 Filing 10 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibits B through F re #4 MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits Under Seal for His Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by John Doe, M.D.. (Acho, Ronald)
January 3, 2022 Filing 9 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibits A through C re #1 Complaint,, by John Doe, M.D.. (Acho, Ronald)
January 3, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to intervene and unseal judicial records by Charles Blackwell. (DPer)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER of RECUSAL and REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds to District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (SSch)
December 30, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald G. Acho on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Acho, Ronald)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #2 Motion for Leave to File Exhibit in Support Complaint Under Seal - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #4 Motion for Leave to File Exhibit Under Seal in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
December 29, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for *Justin Dimick, M.D., Marie Lozon, M.D., The Board of Regents of the University of Michigan* (SKra)
December 29, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits Under Seal for His Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by John Doe, M.D.. (Kasmikha, Saif)
December 29, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Why A Preliminary Injunction Should Not Be Issued by John Doe, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J) (Kasmikha, Saif)
December 29, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits to Verified Complaint Under Seal by John Doe, M.D.. (Kasmikha, Saif)
December 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by John Doe, M.D. against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8737053 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Washtenaw - County of 1st Defendant: Washtenaw. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (Kasmikha, Saif)
December 29, 2021 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe, M.D. v. The Board of Regents of the University of Michigan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe, M.D.
Represented By: Saif R. Kasmikha
Represented By: Ronald G. Acho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Board of Regents of the University of Michigan
Represented By: David A. French
Represented By: Jonathon A. Rabin
Represented By: Larry R. Jensen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marie Lozon, M.D.
Represented By: David A. French
Represented By: Jonathon A. Rabin
Represented By: Larry R. Jensen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Dimick, M.D.
Represented By: Jonathon A. Rabin
Represented By: Larry R. Jensen, Jr.
Represented By: David A. French
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Charles Blackwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?