Z. et al v. Priority Health Managed Benefits et al
Plaintiff: Mark Z. and M. Z.
Defendant: Priority Health Managed Benefits and Michigan Dental Association Health Plan
Case Number: 2:2022cv10007
Filed: January 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Denise Page Hood
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting #26 Motion to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
September 30, 2022 Filing 26 MOTION to Amend/Correct #25 Stipulation and Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines by M. Z., Mark Z.. (King, Brian)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATED ORDER Amending Scheduling Order, (Deadline to Amend Pleadings and Join Parties is 9/30/2022) Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (KGri)
August 9, 2022 Filing 24 Joint MOTION TO EXTEND Deadline to Amend Pleadings or Joinder Parties re #22 Scheduling Order for ERISA, by M. Z., Mark Z.. (King, Brian) Modified on 8/10/2022 (LHos).[DOCUMENT IS A STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER]
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Stay Discovery Pending Outcome of Dispositive Motion. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER for ERISA: Administrative Record due by 11/18/2022 Cross Motions due by 12/2/2022 Response due by 1/6/2023 Motion Hearing set for 2/1/2023 02:00 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
April 20, 2022 Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before District Judge Denise Page Hood: Motion Hearing held on 4/20/2022 re #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Priority Health Managed Benefits Disposition: Motion taken under advisement (Court Reporter: Timothy Floury) (LSau)
April 19, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Martin Hall on behalf of M. Z., Mark Z.. (Hall, Samuel)
March 23, 2022 Filing 20 REPLY to Response re #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Priority Health Managed Benefits. (Guinn, Kristen)
March 16, 2022 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Scheduling Conference Hearing on March 21, 2022 is Cancelled re #14 Notice to Appear. (LSau)
March 14, 2022 Filing 19 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (King, Brian)
March 10, 2022 Filing 18 RESPONSE to #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by M. Z., Mark Z.. (King, Brian)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATED ORDER to Extend Plaintiffs' Opposition Deadline, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss :( Response due by 3/10/2022, Reply due by 3/24/2022) Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
February 17, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Blaine Andrew Veldhuis on behalf of Michigan Dental Association Health Plan. (Veldhuis, Blaine)
February 11, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE OF IN PERSON HEARING on #9 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion Hearing set for 4/20/2022 03:00 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
February 4, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE TO APPEAR IN PERSON: Scheduling Conference set for 3/21/2022 10:00 AM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
February 4, 2022 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michael J. Bovill appearing on behalf of Priority Health Managed Benefits (Bovill, Michael)
February 4, 2022 Filing 12 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Priority Health Managed Benefits (Guinn, Kristen)
February 3, 2022 Filing 11 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Michigan Dental Association Health Plan (Sullivan, Donald)
February 3, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Michigan Dental Association Health Plan. (Sullivan, Donald)
February 3, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by Priority Health Managed Benefits. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (Guinn, Kristen)
January 31, 2022 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Brian Smith King appearing on behalf of M. Z., Mark Z. (King, Brian)
January 21, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert B. June on behalf of M. Z., Mark Z.. (June, Robert)
January 11, 2022 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #5 Order of Substitution/Withdrawal of Attorney by Priority Health Managed Benefits (Guinn, Kristen)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER of Attorney Substitution with stipulation. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (SSch)
January 4, 2022 Filing 4 Docket Sheet from Utah; Case Number 2:21-cv-00650.
January 4, 2022 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: This case has been transferred from the District of Utah. Pending motions must be refiled on this court's docket by the filing party. Attorneys not admitted to practice in this court must complete the attorney admissions application and be admitted before appearing on this court's docket. All previously filed documents can be accessed on the originating court's docket using PACER. (VLun)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Change Venue to the US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan and extending answer deadline to 30 days after confirmation on the docket in the Eastern District of Michigan of the successful transfer of this action to that court. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 1/3/22. (alf) [Transferred from utd on 1/4/2022.]
January 4, 2022 Filing 2 Stipulated MOTION to Change Venue and to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint filed by Defendant Priority Health Managed Benefits. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Shewan, Angela)[Transferred from utd on 1/4/2022.]
January 4, 2022 Filing 1 TRANSFERREDCOMPLAINT against Michigan Dental Association Health Plan, Priority Health Managed Benefits (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4153992) filed by Mark Z., M. Z.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish (King, Brian) [Transferred from Utah; Case Number 2:21-cv-00650.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Z. et al v. Priority Health Managed Benefits et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Z.
Represented By: Brian Smith King
Represented By: Robert B. June
Represented By: Samuel Martin Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. Z.
Represented By: Brian Smith King
Represented By: Robert B. June
Represented By: Samuel Martin Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Priority Health Managed Benefits
Represented By: Kristen E. Guinn
Represented By: Michael J. Bovill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan Dental Association Health Plan
Represented By: Blaine Andrew Veldhuis
Represented By: Donald P. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?