Jackson v. Martino et al
Plaintiff: Jeremiah Jackson
Defendant: Martino, E. Nguyen, E. Parr-Mirza, Obiakar, T. Johnson and John Doe
Case Number: 2:2022cv10161
Filed: January 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
Presiding Judge: Sean F Cox
Referring Judge: Patricia T Morris
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
March 22, 2022 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #13 Order Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge on Jeremiah Jackson 685964 at Carson City (MSP), Carson City Correctional Facility, 10274 Boyer Rd., Carson City MI 48811-9746 (JMcC)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Directing Service Without Prepayment of Costs and Authorizing the US Marshal to Collect Costs After Service is Made. Signed by District Judge David R. Grand. (RLou)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Excluding the Case from the Pro Se Prisoner Mediation Program. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly G. Altman. (RLou)
March 21, 2022 Filing 10 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas)
March 21, 2022 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #12 Order Directing Service by the US Marshal, #11 Order Excluding Case, on Jeremiah Jackson, Pris No. 685964, at Carson City (MSP), Carson City Correctional Facility, 10274 Boyer Rd., Carson City, MI 48811-9746 (RLou)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER STAYING CASE and Referral to the Pro Se Prisoner Early Mediation Program. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
March 14, 2022 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #9 Order Staying Case on Jeremiah Jackson 685964 at Carson City (MSP) Carson City Correctional Facility, 10274 Boyer Rd., Carson City, MI 48811-9746 (JMcC)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 OPINION AND ORDER of Partial Dismissal. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
March 7, 2022 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #8 Order on Jeremiah Jackson 685964 at Carson City (MSP) Carson City Correctional Facility, 10274 Boyer Rd., Carson City, MI 48811-9746 (JMcC)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs and Directing Payment of an Initial Partial Filing Fee in the amount of $0 and subsequent payments. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (SKra)
February 8, 2022 Filing 6 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Jeremiah Jackson. (SSch)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to Correct Deficiency for failure to submit filing fee. Correction due by 3/10/2022 Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (SKra)
February 8, 2022 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #5 Order to Correct Deficiency (Habeas and 1983 Complaints Only) on Jeremiah Jackson Pris. No. 685964 at 10274 Boyer Rd., Carson City, MI 48811-9746. (SKra)
February 4, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Mediation Program (SKra)
January 26, 2022 Filing 3 Docket Sheet from Michigan Western; Case Number 1:22-cv-00008.
January 26, 2022 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: This case has been transferred from the Western District of Michigan. Pending motions must be refiled on this court's docket by the filing party. Attorneys not admitted to practice in this court must complete the attorney admissions application and be admitted before appearing on this court's docket. All previously filed documents can be accessed on the originating court's docket using PACER. (VLun)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Eastern District of Michigan; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw) [Transferred from miwd on 1/26/2022.]
January 26, 2022 Filing 1 TRANSFERREDCOMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jeremiah Jackson #685964 (mlc) [Transferred from Michigan Western; Case Number 1:22-cv-00008.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Martino et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremiah Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Parr-Mirza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Obiakar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?