McLeod v. Bryant et al
Plaintiff: John Michael McLeod
Defendant: Michael Bryant and Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 2:2022cv10729
Filed: April 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Mark A Goldsmith
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2022 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand as required by order of the court filed by John Michael McLeod against All Defendants. (TTho)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SHOW CAUSE ORDER. Show Cause Response due by 4/29/2022. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (KSan)
April 19, 2022 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #5 Order to Show Cause on John Michael McLeod, 1900 Lommis Rd., Jackson, MI 49201 (KSan)
April 11, 2022 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #1 Complaint by John Michael McLeod (DPer)
April 11, 2022 Filing 3 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas)
April 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by John Michael McLeod against Michael Bryant, Internal Revenue Service Receipt No: DET140208 - Fee: $ 402. (LHos)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McLeod v. Bryant et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Michael McLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?