Neo Wireless, LLC v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Neo Wireless, LLC
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 2:2022cv11402
Filed: June 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Terrence G Berg
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 145 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher S. Stewart on behalf of Neo Wireless, LLC. (Stewart, Christopher)
July 20, 2022 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Neo Wireless, LLC against Ford Motor Company. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - '366 Patent, #3 Exhibit 2 - '908 Patent, #4 Exhibit 3 - '941 Patent, #5 Exhibit 4 - '450 Patent, #6 Exhibit 5 - '512 Patent, #7 Exhibit 6 - '302 Patent, #8 Exhibit 7 - Chart Claim 1 '366 Patent, #9 Exhibit 8 - Chart Claim 11 '908 Patent, #10 Exhibit 9 - Chart Claim 13 '941 Patent, #11 Exhibit 10 - Chart Claim 7 '450 Patent, #12 Exhibit 11 - Chart Claim 15 '512 Patent, #13 Exhibit 12 - Chart Claim 23 '302 Patent) (Cassady, Jason)
June 27, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE to Attorneys re: MDL Docket No. 3034 (SSch)
June 27, 2022 Filing 3 Docket Sheet from Missouri Western; Case Number 4:22-cv-00210.
June 27, 2022 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: This case has been transferred from the Western District of Missouri. Pending motions must be refiled on this court's docket by the filing party. Attorneys not admitted to practice in this court must complete the attorney admissions application and be admitted before appearing on this court's docket. All previously filed documents can be accessed on the originating court's docket using PACER. (SSch)
June 23, 2022 Filing 2 MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER, from Karen K Caldwell, Chair of Panel, transferring case to Eastern District of Michigan to be included in MDL No. 3034. Signed on 6/23/2022. Case electronically transferred. (Kern, Kendra) [Transferred from mowd on 6/27/2022.]
March 29, 2022 Filing 1 TRANSFERRED COMPLAINT against Ford Motor Company on behalf of Neo Wireless, LLC. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7865462. Service due by 6/27/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Index 12)(Randol, Brett) (Main Document 1 replaced on 3/29/2022 to remove Civil Cover Sheet from Complaint) (Woods, Gloria). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/29/2022: #13 Civil Cover Sheet) (Woods, Gloria). [Transferred from MOWD; Case Number 4:22-cv-00210]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neo Wireless, LLC v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neo Wireless, LLC
Represented By: Christopher S. Stewart
Represented By: Jason Dodd Cassady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?