Hall et al v. Paint Creek Estates et al
Plaintiff: Jeff Hall and Deann Nash
Defendant: Paint Creek Estates, Brandon Semran, Beth Williams, Faith Aboona, Penny Buxton, Vivian Lopez, Elizabeth Semran, Bart Buxton, Rob Pilat and Jonathan Aboona
Case Number: 2:2022cv11449
Filed: June 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Kimberly G Altman
Referring Judge: Matthew F Leitman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER to Attend Telephonic Scheduling Conference and Notice of Requirements for Submission of Discovery Plan. (TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference set for 9/29/2022 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. **PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR IMPORTANT DEADLINE AND CALL-IN INFORMATION**) Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
August 24, 2022 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Jonathan Aboona, Bart Buxton, Vivian Lopez, Paint Creek Estates, Rob Pilat, Brandon Semran, Elizabeth Semran, Beth Williams. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Affirmative Defenses) (Landry, David)
August 24, 2022 Filing 16 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: David B. Landry appearing on behalf of Jonathan Aboona, Bart Buxton, Vivian Lopez, Paint Creek Estates, Rob Pilat, Brandon Semran, Elizabeth Semran, Beth Williams (Landry, David)
August 3, 2022 Filing 15 SUMMONS Issued for *Rob Pilat* (KBro)
August 3, 2022 Filing 14 SUMMONS Issued for *Bart Buxton* (KBro)
August 3, 2022 Filing 13 SUMMONS Issued for *Jonathan Aboona* (KBro)
August 3, 2022 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Summerfield, Brian)
August 3, 2022 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Jeff Hall, Deann Nash against Bart Buxton, Rob Pilat, Jonathan Aboona. NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Summerfield, Brian)
August 3, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs as to Faith Aboona and Penny Buxton (Summerfield, Brian)
August 3, 2022 REQUEST for SUMMONS for Rob Pilat. (Summerfield, Brian)
August 3, 2022 REQUEST for SUMMONS for Bart Buxton. (Summerfield, Brian)
August 3, 2022 REQUEST for SUMMONS for Jonathan Aboona. (Summerfield, Brian)
July 27, 2022 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Paint Creek Estates served on 7/18/2022, answer due 8/8/2022. (Summerfield, Brian)
July 27, 2022 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Beth Williams served on 7/18/2022, answer due 8/8/2022. (Summerfield, Brian)
July 22, 2022 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Penny Buxton served on 7/12/2022, answer due 8/2/2022. (Summerfield, Brian)
July 22, 2022 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Elizabeth Semran served on 7/12/2022, answer due 8/2/2022. (Summerfield, Brian)
July 22, 2022 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Brandon Semran served on 7/12/2022, answer due 8/2/2022. (Summerfield, Brian)
July 22, 2022 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Faith Aboona served on 7/12/2022, answer due 8/2/2022. (Summerfield, Brian)
July 22, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Faith Aboona served on 7/6/2022, answer due 7/27/2022. (Summerfield, Brian)
June 29, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (LGra)
June 29, 2022 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
June 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8961823 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Summerfield, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall et al v. Paint Creek Estates et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Hall
Represented By: Brian C. Summerfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deann Nash
Represented By: Brian C. Summerfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paint Creek Estates
Represented By: David B. Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Semran
Represented By: David B. Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beth Williams
Represented By: David B. Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faith Aboona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penny Buxton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vivian Lopez
Represented By: David B. Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Semran
Represented By: David B. Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bart Buxton
Represented By: David B. Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Pilat
Represented By: David B. Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Aboona
Represented By: David B. Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?