Bonds et al v. Compass Group et al
Plaintiff: Denise Bonds and Shenesia Rhodes
Defendant: Compass Group, Crothall Healthcare Inc., Tenet Healthcare Corporation, VHS, Inc., VHS of Michigan, Inc. dba Detroit Medical Center and VHS Harper-Hutzel Hospital, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2022cv11491
Filed: June 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Curtis Ivy
Referring Judge: David M Lawson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31 U.S.C. ยง 3729 False Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER to Extend Time to Answer or Respond to #1 Complaint. Answer or Response due by 9/22/2022. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin)
August 12, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE TO APPEAR IN PERSON: Scheduling Conference set for 10/3/2022 at 3:30 PM before District Judge David M. Lawson. (See image for document deadline.) (SPin)
August 11, 2022 Filing 14 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint by Tenet Healthcare Corporation, VHS Harper-Hutzel Hospital, Inc., VHS of Michigan, Inc. dba Detroit Medical Center, VHS, Inc. (Hickey, Patrick)
August 11, 2022 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Stefanie R. Reagan appearing on behalf of Tenet Healthcare Corporation, VHS Harper-Hutzel Hospital, Inc., VHS of Michigan, Inc. dba Detroit Medical Center, VHS, Inc. (Reagan, Stefanie)
August 11, 2022 Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: William Joseph O'Brien appearing on behalf of Tenet Healthcare Corporation, VHS Harper-Hutzel Hospital, Inc., VHS of Michigan, Inc. dba Detroit Medical Center, VHS, Inc. (O'Brien, William)
August 11, 2022 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Patrick F. Hickey appearing on behalf of Tenet Healthcare Corporation, VHS Harper-Hutzel Hospital, Inc., VHS of Michigan, Inc. dba Detroit Medical Center, VHS, Inc. (Hickey, Patrick)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER to Extend Time to Answer or Respond to #1 Complaint. Answer or Response due by 9/22/2022. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin)
August 3, 2022 Filing 9 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer, Move, or Respond to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by Compass Group, Crothall Healthcare Inc. (Giffen, Jaclyn)
August 3, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jaclyn R. Giffen on behalf of Compass Group, Crothall Healthcare Inc.. (Giffen, Jaclyn)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Dismissing #4 Order to Show Cause. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin)
July 13, 2022 Filing 6 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by All Plaintiffs. (Taweel, Nineveh)
July 13, 2022 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by All Plaintiffs against Compass Group, Crothall Healthcare Inc., Tenet Healthcare Corporation, VHS Harper-Hutzel Hospital, Inc., VHS of Michigan, Inc. dba Detroit Medical Center. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Taweel, Nineveh)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Denise Bonds and Shenesia Rhodes to Show Cause why Case Should Not be Dismissed Without Prejudice for Want of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. Show Cause Response due by 7/18/2022. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin)
July 5, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (TTho)
July 5, 2022 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (TTho)
July 1, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Azzam E. Elder on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Elder, Azzam)
June 30, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8965263 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Taweel, Nineveh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bonds et al v. Compass Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Bonds
Represented By: Nineveh Korkis Taweel
Represented By: Azzam E. Elder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shenesia Rhodes
Represented By: Nineveh Korkis Taweel
Represented By: Azzam E. Elder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compass Group
Represented By: Jaclyn R. Giffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crothall Healthcare Inc.
Represented By: Jaclyn R. Giffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tenet Healthcare Corporation
Represented By: Patrick F. Hickey
Represented By: Stefanie R. Reagan
Represented By: William Joseph O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VHS, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick F. Hickey
Represented By: Stefanie R. Reagan
Represented By: William Joseph O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VHS of Michigan, Inc. dba Detroit Medical Center
Represented By: Patrick F. Hickey
Represented By: Stefanie R. Reagan
Represented By: William Joseph O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VHS Harper-Hutzel Hospital, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick F. Hickey
Represented By: Stefanie R. Reagan
Represented By: William Joseph O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?