Eden v. Keinath et al
Plaintiff: Jesse Eden
Defendant: Nicole Keinath, M. Tank, J. Darling, Tracy Kensley, Paul D. Rich, Timothy E. Torp and John Doe
Case Number: 2:2022cv11515
Filed: June 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: George Caram Steeh
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 OBJECTION to #4 Opinion and order by Jesse Eden; with request to amend complaint. (DPer)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Jesse Eden. (LHos)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 OPINION and ORDER of Partial Summary Dismissal. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (BSau)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #4 Memorandum Opinion & Order, Add and Terminate Parties mailed to Jesse Eden 109112 at Sanilac County Jail, 65 N. Elk, Sandusky, MI 48471. (BSau)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs and Directing Payment of an Initial Partial Filing Fee in the amount of $0 and subsequent payments. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (TTho)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Jesse Eden. (TTho)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Jesse Eden against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet) (TTho)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eden v. Keinath et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Eden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Keinath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Tank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Darling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Kensley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul D. Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy E. Torp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?