Henni v. Standard Fuel Engineering Company
Plaintiff: Carl Henni and Gladys Henni
Defendant: Standard Fuel Engineering Company
Case Number: 2:2022cv11608
Filed: July 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Kimberly G Altman
Referring Judge: Mark A Goldsmith
2 Judge: Curtis Ivy
3 Judge: Judith E Levy
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Declaratory Judgemen
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2022 Filing 12 REPLY to Response re #8 MOTION to Remand filed by All Plaintiffs. (Holman-Jensen, Margaret)
August 24, 2022 Minute Entry for virtual proceedings before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith: Status Conference held on 8/24/2022 (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (KSan)
August 23, 2022 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #8 MOTION to Remand filed by Standard Fuel Engineering Company. (Gostek, Katharine)
August 18, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE: Status Conference set for 8/24/2022 11:00 AM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith (KSan)
August 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Regarding Filings. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (KSan)
August 9, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9) (Holman-Jensen, Margaret)
August 9, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Holman-Jensen on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Holman-Jensen, Margaret)
August 9, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Abramson on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Abramson, Eric)
August 8, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip J. Goodman on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Goodman, Philip)
August 8, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Abraham Snider on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Snider, Abraham)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Judith E. Levy and Magistrate Judge Kimberly G. Altman in Ann Arbor to District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith and Magistrate Judge Curtis Ivy, Jr in Detroit. (SSch)
August 3, 2022 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Standard Fuel Engineering Company (Gostek, Katharine)
July 18, 2022 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DPer)
July 18, 2022 NOTICE of error directed to Katharine Gostek re #1 Notice of Removal. Parties listed on the initiating document were omitted. The filing attorney must use the docket event Addition of Parties to correct the error. Also, the corporate disclosure statement should be filed separately. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (DPer)
July 14, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Wayne County Circuit, case number 20-007746-NP. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8979844 - Fee: $ 402 [Previously dismissed case: Wayne County Circuit Court, 20-007746-NP, Judge Patricia Fresard] [Possible companion case(s): Wayne County Circuit Court, 20-016314-NP, Judge Patricia Fresard] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Document Continuation Corporate Disclosure Statement) (Gostek, Katharine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henni v. Standard Fuel Engineering Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Henni
Represented By: Abraham Snider
Represented By: Eric Abramson
Represented By: Margaret Holman-Jensen
Represented By: Philip J. Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gladys Henni
Represented By: Eric Abramson
Represented By: Margaret Holman-Jensen
Represented By: Abraham Snider
Represented By: Philip J. Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Fuel Engineering Company
Represented By: Katharine Gostek
Represented By: Patrick M. Fishman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?