FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION v. Chicago Three Holdings LLC
Plaintiff: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, d/b/a Fannie Mae
Defendant: Chicago Three Holdings LLC
Receiver: Tarantino Properties, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2022cv11884
Filed: August 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Gershwin A Drain
Referring Judge: Jonathan JC Grey
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER for substitution of counsel. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (DPer)
August 23, 2022 Filing 13 Receiver's BOND in the amount of $ 10,000.00 posted by Tarantino Properties, Inc. (Uetz, Ann Marie)
August 19, 2022 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #11 Notice of Appearance by Chicago Three Holdings LLC (Ehrlichman, Erica)
August 19, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Erica J. Ehrlichman on behalf of Chicago Three Holdings LLC. (Ehrlichman, Erica)
August 19, 2022 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #9 Notice of Appearance by Chicago Three Holdings LLC (Findling, David)
August 19, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Findling on behalf of Chicago Three Holdings LLC. (Findling, David)
August 18, 2022 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Chicago Three Holdings LLC waiver sent on 8/17/2022, answer due 10/17/2022. (Uetz, Ann Marie)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CORRECTED Agreed ORDER Appointing Receiver and Other Relief #4 Order on Motion to Appoint Receiver. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg)
August 16, 2022 Filing 6 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, d/b/a Fannie Mae (Uetz, Ann Marie)
August 16, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew T. McClain on behalf of FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, d/b/a Fannie Mae. (McClain, Andrew)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Agreed ORDER Appointing Receiver and Other Relief #3 Motion to Appoint Receiver. Tarantino Properties, Inc. appointed. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg)
August 15, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Receiver and for Preliminary Relief (Uncontested) by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, d/b/a Fannie Mae. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Fed. Nat'l Mortg. Assoc. v. Maple Creek Gardens, LLC, #3 Exhibit 2 - Receiverships in the Real Estate Setting, #4 Exhibit 3 - Tarantino Properties and Salvatore Anthony Thomas Information, #5 Exhibit 4 - Proposed Agreed Order) (Uetz, Ann Marie)
August 15, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Chicago Three Holdings LLC* (DAll)
August 15, 2022 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll)
August 12, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, d/b/a Fannie Mae against Chicago Three Holdings LLC. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9016111 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): U.S. District Court, Eastern District of Michigan, 22-11783, Judge Gershwin Drain] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Verification, #3 Exhibit B - Legal Description, #4 Exhibit C - Note and Loan Agreement, #5 Exhibit D - Mortgage, #6 Exhibit E - UCC, #7 Exhibit F - Assignments, #8 Exhibit G - Notice of Default, #9 Exhibit H - Pre-negotiation Letter) (Uetz, Ann Marie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION v. Chicago Three Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, d/b/a Fannie Mae
Represented By: Ann Marie Uetz
Represented By: Andrew T. McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Three Holdings LLC
Represented By: John W. Polderman
Represented By: David M. Findling
Represented By: Erica J. Ehrlichman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: Tarantino Properties, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?