Bass v. T-Mobile USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Troy Bass
Defendant: T-Mobile USA, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2022cv11975
Filed: August 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sean F Cox
Referring Judge: Jonathan JC Grey
2 Judge: Curtis Ivy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting in part #27 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Curtis Ivy, Jr. (SKra)
September 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Granting #32 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Benjamin A. Stone by T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Stone, Benjamin)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 REPLY to Response re #27 MOTION to Compel Supplemental Discovery Responses filed by Troy Bass. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1, Plaintiff's Deficiency Letter, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2, Discovery Emails) (Hurwitz, Noah)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 RESPONSE to #27 MOTION to Compel Supplemental Discovery Responses filed by T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4) (Culberson, Elyse)
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Deadline for Defendant to Respond to #27 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendant's Discovery Responses. Response due by 8/17/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Curtis Ivy, Jr. (MacKay, K)
July 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge Curtis Ivy, Jr: #27 MOTION to Compel Supplemental Discovery Responses filed by Troy Bass. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
July 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION to Compel Supplemental Discovery Responses by Troy Bass. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1, Plaintiff's Discovery Requests, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2, Defendant's Responses to Plaintiff's Discovery Requests, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3, Plaintiff's Deficiency Letter, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4, EEOC v. Abercrombie, #5 Exhibit Ex. 5, Chalmers v. Tulon) (Hurwitz, Noah)
July 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Text-Only Order of reassignment from Magistrate Judge Jonathan J.C. Grey - MJ to Magistrate Judge Curtis Ivy, Jr pursuant to Administrative Order 23-AO-009. (NAhm)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Expert Disclosures and Status Conference by 60 days. (Status Conference re Facilitation reset for 11/7/2023 02:00 PM before District Judge Sean F. Cox) Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE by Troy Bass of withdrawal of #23 MOTION to Amend/Correct #8 Amended Complaint . (Hurwitz, Noah)
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 RESPONSE to #23 MOTION to Amend/Correct #8 Amended Complaint filed by T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Culberson, Elyse)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION to Amend/Correct #8 Amended Complaint by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1, Mr. Fluecks EEOC Right to Sue Letter, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2, Examples of Consolidation, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3, Defendants Position Statement, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4, May 19, 2023 Email, #5 Exhibit Ex. 5, May 23, 2023 Email, #6 Exhibit Ex. 6, May 24, 2023 Email, #7 Exhibit Ex. 7, Proposed Second Amended Complaint) (Hurwitz, Noah)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PRELIMINARY LAY WITNESS LIST by T-Mobile USA, Inc. (Culberson, Elyse)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Plaintiff's Lay WITNESS LIST by Troy Bass (Childress, Brendan)
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia Anderson Pryor on behalf of T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Pryor, Patricia)
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Elyse K. Culberson on behalf of T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Culberson, Elyse)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER for substitution of counsel. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (DPer)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Discovery Extension. (Discovery due by 10/31/2023, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 11/28/2023) Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 8/31/2023, Status Conference re Facilitation set for 9/12/2023 at 03:00 PM before District Judge Sean F. Cox, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 9/27/2023, Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/20/2024 at 02:00 PM before District Judge Sean F. Cox, Trailing Trial Docket set for March/April 2024. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (Refer to image for additional dates) (JMcC)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before District Judge Sean F. Cox: Scheduling Conference held on 2/28/2023. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (JMcC)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Bonnette, Terry)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin A Stone on behalf of T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Stone, Benjamin)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE TO APPEAR IN PERSON: Scheduling Conference set for 2/28/2023 at 03:30PM before District Judge Sean F. Cox (Zaidel, B)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Reliance on Jury Demand by T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Bonnette, Terry)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to #8 Amended Complaint. (Responsive Pleading due by 1/20/2023) Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Denying Without Prejudice as Moot #5 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by T-Mobile USA, Inc. (Bonnette, Terry)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Hurwitz, Noah)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan John Childress on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Childress, Brendan)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by T-Mobile USA, Inc. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Bonnette, Terry)
October 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Terry W. Bonnette appearing on behalf of T-Mobile USA, Inc. (Bonnette, Terry)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. All Defendants. (Hurwitz, Noah)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *T-Mobile USA, Inc.* (DPer)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9028180 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Hurwitz, Noah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bass v. T-Mobile USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Bass
Represented By: Noah S. Hurwitz
Represented By: Brendan John Childress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-Mobile USA, Inc.
Represented By: Terry W. Bonnette
Represented By: Elyse K. Culberson
Represented By: Patricia Anderson Pryor
Represented By: Benjamin A Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?