Reese v. Thompson
Plaintiff: Terrell Reese
Defendant: Thompson
Case Number: 2:2022cv12369
Filed: October 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Mark A Goldsmith
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Terrell Reese. (SSch)
November 1, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Limited Appearance by Austin C. Raines on behalf of Thompson for the purposes of the Pro Se Prisoner Early Mediation Program. (Raines, Austin)
October 31, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Terrell Reese. (NAhm)
October 19, 2022 Filing 6 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs and Directing Payment of an Initial Partial Filing Fee in the amount of $30.00 and subsequent payments. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (SKra)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER STAYING CASE and Referral to the Pro Se Prisoner Early Mediation Program. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (KSan)
October 11, 2022 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #4 Order Staying Case on Terrell Reese,669959,EARNEST C. BROOKS CORRECTIONAL FACILITY,2500 S. SHERIDAN DRIVE, MUSKEGON HEIGHTS, MI 49444 (KSan)
October 7, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Mediation Program (DAll)
October 5, 2022 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Terrell Reese. (DAll)
October 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Terrell Reese against Thompson (DAll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reese v. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrell Reese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thompson
Represented By: Austin C. Raines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?