Duncan v. Magna Seating of America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Darla Duncan
Defendant: Magna Seating of America, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2022cv12700
Filed: November 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Jonathan JC Grey
Referring Judge: Jonathan JC Grey - MJ
2 Judge: Linda V Parker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 REPLY to Response re #23 MOTION for Order equitably tolling statute of limitations for potential opt-in plaintiffs filed by Darla Duncan. (Grimsley, Matthew)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 RESPONSE to #23 MOTION for Order equitably tolling statute of limitations for potential opt-in plaintiffs filed by Magna Seating of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits 1) (Rubin, Allan)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION for Order equitably tolling statute of limitations for potential opt-in plaintiffs by Darla Duncan. (Grimsley, Matthew)
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE by Darla Duncan of Filing Consent Forms (Attachments: #1 Ariel Daniels, #2 Alonda Hall) (Grimsley, Matthew)
June 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Joint Status Report REPORT by Magna Seating of America, Inc. (Waslawski, Daniel)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Joint MOTION TO EXTEND Time to File Joint Status Report by All Plaintiffs. (Grimsley, Matthew)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER: The Court GRANTS #20 Joint MOTION TO EXTEND Time to File Joint Status Report filed by Darla Duncan.( Status Report due by 6/9/2023). IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (AFla)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Withdrawal of #17 Motion for Order and Granting #18 Motion to Stay. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (LHos)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION to Stay Case Pending an Imminent Decision by the Sixth Circuit on the Propriety of the FlLSA Two-Stage Certification Process by Magna Seating of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Waslawski, Daniel)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for Order for Conditional Certification, Expedited Opt-In Discovery, and Court-Supervised Notice to Potential Opt-In Plaintiffs by Darla Duncan. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Darla Duncan, #4 Exhibit 3 - Declarations of Opt-In Plaintiffs, #5 Exhibit 4 - Plaintiff's Opt-In Discovery Request, #6 Exhibit 5 - Proposed Notice to Potential Class Members, #7 Exhibit 6 - Proposed Text Message Language) (Grimsley, Matthew)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Joint MOTION to Vacate #12 Notice to Appear Case Management Status and Scheduling Conference by Darla Duncan. (Grimsley, Matthew)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Grimsley, Matthew)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Scheduling Conference on 2/16/2023 is Cancelled re #12 Notice to Appear (AFla)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER GRANTING #16 Joint MOTION to Vacate #12 Notice to Appear Case Management Status and Scheduling Conference filed by Darla Duncan. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (AFla)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric R Magnus on behalf of Magna Seating of America, Inc.. (Magnus, Eric)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel C. Waslawski on behalf of Magna Seating of America, Inc.. (Waslawski, Daniel)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Scheduling Conference set for 2/16/2023 12:00 PM before District Judge Linda V. Parker. (AFla)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Magna Seating of America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Magna International, Inc. for Magna Seating of America, Inc.. (Rubin, Allan)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Magna Seating of America, Inc.. (Rubin, Allan)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Vacating #6 Order to Show Cause - Failure to Prosecute. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (AFla)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE by Darla Duncan of Filing Consent Form (Attachments: #1 Lauren Evans' Consent Form) (Grimsley, Matthew)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Darla Duncan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Grimsley, Matthew)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Plaintiff(s) to Show Cause Why This Case Should Not be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute. Show Cause Response due by 1/26/2023. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (AFla)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Magna Seating of America, Inc. served on 12/1/2022, answer due 12/22/2022. (Grimsley, Matthew)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Magna Seating of America, Inc.* (SSch)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SSch)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Grimsley on behalf of Darla Duncan. (Grimsley, Matthew)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE by Darla Duncan of Filing Consent Forms (Attachments: #1 Kesha Glover's Consent Form, #2 Tyson Jones' Consent Form, #3 Joel Ramirez's Consent Form, #4 Michelle Timms' Consent Form, #5 Rosanna Wescott's Consent Form) (Lazzaro, Anthony)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Darla Duncan against Magna Seating of America, Inc. with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9122302 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Darla Duncan's Consent Form) (Lazzaro, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duncan v. Magna Seating of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darla Duncan
Represented By: Anthony J Lazzaro
Represented By: Matthew Grimsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magna Seating of America, Inc.
Represented By: Allan S. Rubin
Represented By: Daniel C. Waslawski
Represented By: Eric R Magnus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?