Lear Corporation v. Woodbridge Foam Corporation
Plaintiff: Lear Corporation
Defendant: Woodbridge Foam Corporation
Case Number: 2:2022cv13060
Filed: December 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Matthew F Leitman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CASE MANAGEMENT REQUIREMENTS AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact Discovery due by 8/18/2023, Expert Discovery due by 11/17/2023, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 12/18/2023, Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/1/2024 at 1:30 PM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman, Jury Trial set for 5/14/2024 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (Refer to image for additional dates) (HRya)
February 13, 2023 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Video Scheduling Conference on 2/15/2023 is Cancelled re #15 Order to Appear. The Court will issue a scheduling order pursuant to the Joint Discovery Plan. (HRya)
February 10, 2023 Filing 18 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Raphelson, Jeffrey)
January 30, 2023 Filing 17 ANSWER to Counterclaim with Affirmative Defenses by Lear Corporation. (Raphelson, Jeffrey)
January 13, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Cross on behalf of Lear Corporation. (Cross, Emily)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO ATTEND VIDEO SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS FOR SUBMISSION OF DISCOVERY PLAN: Scheduling Conference set for 2/15/2023 at 1:30 PM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. **PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR IMPORTANT DEADLINE AND ZOOM LINK** (HRya)
January 10, 2023 Filing 14 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Lear Corporation (Raphelson, Jeffrey)
January 9, 2023 Filing 13 COUNTERCLAIM filed by Woodbridge Foam Corporation against Lear Corporation (Jeffers, Benjamin)
January 9, 2023 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Woodbridge Foam Corporation. (Jeffers, Benjamin)
January 9, 2023 Filing 11 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Woodbridge Foam Corporation (Jeffers, Benjamin)
January 9, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by William Joseph O'Brien on behalf of Woodbridge Foam Corporation. (O'Brien, William)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATED INTERIM ORDER on Lear Corporation's #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
December 21, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin W. Jeffers on behalf of Woodbridge Foam Corporation. (Jeffers, Benjamin)
December 21, 2022 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Motion Hearing on 12/22/2022 is Cancelled re #7 Notice of Hearing on Motion. (HRya)
December 20, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF VIDEO CONFERENCE HEARING on #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion Hearing set for 12/22/2022 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. |Zoom Webinar Information: https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1613103645?pwd=bXowbjA4R2o4aHNoWFp4VXpJejRSQT09 Passcode: 171798 Or One tap mobile : US: +16692545252,,1613103645# or +16468287666,,1613103645#| (HRya)
December 20, 2022 Minute Entry for virtual proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Status Conference held on 12/20/2022. (Court Reporter: Rob Smith) (HRya)
December 19, 2022 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Woodbridge Foam Corporation served on 12/19/2022, answer due 1/9/2023. (Raphelson, Jeffrey)
December 19, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE: Status Conference set for 12/20/2022 at 2:30 PM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
December 19, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Lear Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 2 - December 12, 2022 Jacobson Email, #4 Exhibit 3 - LSA and Addenda, #5 Exhibit 4 - Lear Terms, #6 Exhibit 5 - July 1, 2022 PO1005112 Version 13, #7 Exhibit 6 - October 1, 2021 PO100512 Version 16, #8 Exhibit 7 - October 17, 2022 PO1025480 Version 8, #9 Exhibit 8 - August 15, 2022 Kovach Email, #10 Exhibit 9 - September 1, 2022 Hebert Email, #11 Exhibit 10 - Lear Corporation v Dura Automotive Systems Inc, #12 Exhibit 11 - Cafe Cola v Somojo, #13 Exhibit 12 - AK Steel Corp v Colton, #14 Exhibit 13 - Key Safety Systems Inc v Invista SARL LLC) (Raphelson, Jeffrey)
December 19, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE: Status Conference set for 12/19/2022 at 2:45 PM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
December 19, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Woodbridge Foam Corporation* (SSch)
December 19, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Breach of Contract, Injunctive and Other Relief filed by Lear Corporation against Woodbridge Foam Corporation. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9167582 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Out of Country. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - 09.01.2022 Hebert Email, #3 Exhibit 2 - Lear Terms, #4 Exhibit 3 - 07.1.2021 PO1005112 Version 13, #5 Exhibit 4 - 10.1.2021 PO1005112 Version 16, #6 Exhibit 5 - 10.17.2022 PO 1025480 Version 8, #7 Exhibit 6 - 12.12.2022 Jacobson Email, #8 Exhibit 7 - LSA and Addenda, #9 Exhibit 8 - 08.15.2022 Kovach Email) (Raphelson, Jeffrey)
December 19, 2022 Minute Entry for virtual proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Status Conference held on 12/19/2022. Court to hold additional status conference tomorrow at 2:30 p.m. (Court Reporter: Rob Smith) (HRya)
December 19, 2022 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SSch)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lear Corporation v. Woodbridge Foam Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lear Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey G. Raphelson
Represented By: Emily Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woodbridge Foam Corporation
Represented By: William Joseph O'Brien
Represented By: Benjamin W. Jeffers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?