G&G Closed-Circuit Events, LLC v. Shaba et al
Plaintiff: G&G Closed-Circuit Events, LLC
Defendant: Rawang Habeeb Shaba, Green Patio, LLC, Rawnag Habeeb Shaba and Bombshells Bar and Eats
Case Number: 2:2023cv10031
Filed: January 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Paul D Borman
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed Question: Fed Communications Act of 1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE TO APPEAR IN PERSON: Settlement Conference set for 9/26/2023 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti in Courtroom 672. **Settlement statements are due by 9/19/23.** Please refer to Judge Patti's Settlement Conference Practice guidelines available at https://www.mied.uscourts.gov/index.cfm?pageFunction=chambers&judgeid=51 (LHos)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REFERRING OTHER MATTERS to Magistrate Judge Patti : Settlement Conference (to be scheduled between 8/25/2023 and 10/27/2023). Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact Discovery due by 8/25/2023; Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 11/30/2023 Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (Refer to image for additional dates) (DTof)
February 21, 2023 Filing 14 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Hubbell, Clinton)
January 27, 2023 Filing 13 STATEMENT of OF DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS AND FINANCIAL INTEREST by All Defendants (Kontry, Bryan)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REQUIRING PARTIES TO MEET AND TO FILE JOINT FED.R.CIV.P. 26 PLAN Discovery plan due by 2/17/2023 Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
January 27, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew W. Mychalowych on behalf of All Defendants. (Mychalowych, Andrew)
January 27, 2023 Filing 10 ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by All Defendants. (Kontry, Bryan)
January 9, 2023 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #4 Order Requiring Responsive Pleading by G&G Closed-Circuit Events, LLC. (Hubbell, Clinton)
January 9, 2023 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Green Patio, LLC served on 1/7/2023, answer due 1/30/2023. (Hubbell, Clinton)
January 9, 2023 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Rawnag Habeeb Shaba served on 1/7/2023, answer due 1/30/2023. (Hubbell, Clinton)
January 6, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued for *Rawnag Habeeb Shaba* (KBro)
January 6, 2023 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by G&G Closed-Circuit Events, LLC against Green Patio, LLC, Rawang Habeeb Shaba. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Hubbell, Clinton)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF LLC TO DISCLOSE INDIVIDUAL MEMBERS Response due by 1/18/2023 Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
January 6, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Rawang Habeeb Shaba* (KBro)
January 6, 2023 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Green Patio, LLC* (KBro)
January 6, 2023 REQUEST for SUMMONS for Rawnag Habeeb Shaba. (Hubbell, Clinton)
January 5, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by G&G Closed-Circuit Events, LLC against Green Patio, LLC, Rawang Habeeb Shaba. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9185257 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Macomb - County of 1st Defendant: Macomb. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Hubbell, Clinton)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: G&G Closed-Circuit Events, LLC v. Shaba et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G&G Closed-Circuit Events, LLC
Represented By: Clinton J. Hubbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rawang Habeeb Shaba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Patio, LLC
Represented By: Bryan Edward Kontry
Represented By: Andrew W. Mychalowych
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rawnag Habeeb Shaba
Represented By: Andrew W. Mychalowych
Represented By: Bryan Edward Kontry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bombshells Bar and Eats
Represented By: Andrew W. Mychalowych
Represented By: Bryan Edward Kontry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?