Nowacki et al v. Gilead Sciences, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mark Nowacki, Daniel Nowacki and Kathleen P Nowacki
Defendant: Gilead Sciences, Inc., St. Joseph Mercy Chelsea, Inc. and St. Joseph Mercy Chelsea, Inc. d/b/a St. Joseph Mercy Chelsea
Case Number: 2:2023cv10276
Filed: February 2, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Curtis Ivy
Referring Judge: Victoria A Roberts
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam J Spicer on behalf of Gilead Sciences, Inc.. (Spicer, Adam)
March 24, 2023 Filing 20 REPLY to Response re #6 MOTION to Dismiss - Defendant Gilead Sciences, Inc's Reply Brief in Support Of Its Motion To Dismiss filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc.. (Bucholtz, Jeffrey)
March 24, 2023 Filing 19 REPLY to Response re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by St. Joseph Mercy Chelsea, Inc.. (Nauts, David)
March 23, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey S. Bucholtz on behalf of Gilead Sciences, Inc.. (Bucholtz, Jeffrey)
March 22, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Vives on behalf of Gilead Sciences, Inc.. (Vives, Michael)
March 21, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Zousmer on behalf of Gilead Sciences, Inc.. (Zousmer, Julia)
March 20, 2023 Filing 15 RESPONSE to #10 MOTION to Remand filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc.. (Houk, Kelly)
March 20, 2023 Filing 14 RESPONSE to #10 MOTION to Remand filed by St. Joseph Mercy Chelsea, Inc.. (Nauts, David)
March 20, 2023 Filing 13 REPLY to Response re #10 MOTION to Remand filed by St. Joseph Mercy Chelsea, Inc.. (Nauts, David)
March 10, 2023 Filing 12 RESPONSE to #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit) (Khahra, Kanwarpreet)
March 10, 2023 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit) (Khahra, Kanwarpreet)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by St. Joseph Mercy Chelsea, Inc., #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc. Plaintiff's counsel granted one day extension to file response briefs, office is without internet. Responses due: 3/10/2023. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer)
March 6, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit FDA recall, #4 Exhibit FDA approval, #5 Exhibit PREP Act advisory opinion, #6 Exhibit April 6th letter from St. Joseph Mercy Hospital, #7 Exhibit Certificate of Compliance LR 7.1(a)) (Johnson, Vernon)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER STRIKING 8 MOTION to Remand filed by Mark Nowacki, Kathleen P Nowacki, Daniel Nowacki. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time to Respond to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss , #5 MOTION to Dismiss : Response due by 3/9/2023. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer)
February 9, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Gilead Sciences, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 GILEAD SCIENCES, INC.'S MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF GILEAD'S MOTION TO DISMISS) (Mayfield, Bonnie)
February 9, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by St. Joseph Mercy Chelsea, Inc.. (Nauts, David)
February 9, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by David R. Nauts on behalf of St. Joseph Mercy Chelsea, Inc.. (Nauts, David)
February 3, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly R. Houk on behalf of Gilead Sciences, Inc.. (Houk, Kelly)
February 3, 2023 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (NAhm)
February 2, 2023 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Gilead Sciences, Inc. (Mayfield, Bonnie)
February 2, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Gilead Sciences, Inc. from Washtenaw County Circuit Court, case number 2022-001761-NP. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9221879 - Fee: $ 402 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - All Process and Pleadings Served Upon Gilead Sciences, Inc., #3 Exhibit B - All Process and Pleadings Served Upon St. Joseph Mercy Chelsea, #4 Exhibit C - Consent to Removal) (Mayfield, Bonnie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nowacki et al v. Gilead Sciences, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Nowacki
Represented By: Kanwarpreet Singh Khahra
Represented By: Vernon R Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Nowacki
Represented By: Kanwarpreet Singh Khahra
Represented By: Vernon R Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen P Nowacki
Represented By: Kanwarpreet Singh Khahra
Represented By: Vernon R Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Represented By: Bonnie L. Mayfield
Represented By: Michael Vives
Represented By: Adam J Spicer
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Bucholtz
Represented By: Julia Zousmer
Represented By: Kelly R. Houk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Joseph Mercy Chelsea, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Joseph Mercy Chelsea, Inc. d/b/a St. Joseph Mercy Chelsea
Represented By: David R. Nauts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?