Menge v. Shafii et al
Plaintiff: Brian Menge
Defendant: KHURSHEED ASH SHAFII, SHANNAINE ROBINSON, TEMEKA MANICA, I KA UELA MARTIN,, JAMAL K THOMAS, Hubert Yopp, Ika Uela Martin, Highland Park, City of, Khursheed Ash-Shafii, Sharmaine Robinson, Temeko Manica and Kallel Martin
Case Number: 2:2023cv11339
Filed: June 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: George Caram Steeh
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Parties are to submit a Joint Discovery Plan by 9/5/2023. The Court will determine at that time if a Scheduling Conference will need to be set or will enter a Scheduling Order based off the Joint Discovery Plan. Entered by District Judge George Caram Steeh. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MLan)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek A. Hurt on behalf of Hubert Yopp. (Hurt, Derek)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Khursheed Ash-Shafii, Highland Park, City of, Temeka Manica, Temeko Manica, Ika Uela Martin, Kallel Martin, Shannaine Robinson, Sharmaine Robinson, Khursheed Ash Shafii, Jamal K Thomas (Petrusak, Nathan)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Khursheed Ash-Shafii, Highland Park, City of, Temeka Manica, Temeko Manica, Ika Uela Martin, Kallel Martin, Shannaine Robinson, Sharmaine Robinson, Khursheed Ash Shafii, Jamal K Thomas. (Petrusak, Nathan)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Hubert Yopp. (McGinnis, James)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Hubert Yopp. (McGinnis, James)
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott R. Ruark on behalf of Khursheed Ash-Shafii, Highland Park, City of, Temeka Manica, Temeko Manica, Ika Uela Martin, Kallel Martin, Shannaine Robinson, Sharmaine Robinson, Khursheed Ash Shafii, Jamal K Thomas. (Ruark, Scott)
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by James W. McGinnis on behalf of Hubert Yopp. (McGinnis, James)
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc D. Kaszubski on behalf of Khursheed Ash-Shafii, Highland Park, City of, Temeka Manica, Temeko Manica, Ika Uela Martin, Kallel Martin, Shannaine Robinson, Sharmaine Robinson, Khursheed Ash Shafii, Jamal K Thomas. (Kaszubski, Marc)
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan D. Petrusak on behalf of Khursheed Ash-Shafii, Highland Park, City of, Temeka Manica, Temeko Manica, Ika Uela Martin, Kallel Martin, Shannaine Robinson, Sharmaine Robinson, Khursheed Ash Shafii, Jamal K Thomas. (Petrusak, Nathan)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #4 Amended Complaint by Brian Menge of All Defendants (Kyle, Robin)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for *Temeko Manica, Kallel Martin, Sharmaine Robinson* (NAhm)
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order REQUEST for SUMMONS for Temeko Manica. (Kyle, Robin)
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order REQUEST for SUMMONS for Sharmaine Robinson. (Kyle, Robin)
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order REQUEST for SUMMONS for Kallel Martin. (Kyle, Robin)
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Brian Menge against All Defendants. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Kyle, Robin)
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Highland Park, City of* (DPer)
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Defendant CITY OF HIGHLAND PARK, MI. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #1 Complaint,, Plaintiff requests summons issued. (Kyle, Robin)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (DAll)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Brian Menge against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9372705 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): United States District Court, 21-cv-10152, Judge Mark A. Goldsmith] (Kyle, Robin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Menge v. Shafii et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Menge
Represented By: Robin H. Kyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KHURSHEED ASH SHAFII
Represented By: Marc D. Kaszubski
Represented By: Nathan D. Petrusak
Represented By: Scott R. Ruark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHANNAINE ROBINSON
Represented By: Marc D. Kaszubski
Represented By: Nathan D. Petrusak
Represented By: Scott R. Ruark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEMEKA MANICA
Represented By: Marc D. Kaszubski
Represented By: Scott R. Ruark
Represented By: Nathan D. Petrusak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I KA UELA MARTIN,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMAL K THOMAS
Represented By: Marc D. Kaszubski
Represented By: Nathan D. Petrusak
Represented By: Scott R. Ruark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hubert Yopp
Represented By: James W. McGinnis
Represented By: Derek A. Hurt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ika Uela Martin
Represented By: Marc D. Kaszubski
Represented By: Nathan D. Petrusak
Represented By: Scott R. Ruark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highland Park, City of
Represented By: Marc D. Kaszubski
Represented By: Nathan D. Petrusak
Represented By: Scott R. Ruark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Khursheed Ash-Shafii
Represented By: Marc D. Kaszubski
Represented By: Nathan D. Petrusak
Represented By: Scott R. Ruark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharmaine Robinson
Represented By: Scott R. Ruark
Represented By: Marc D. Kaszubski
Represented By: Nathan D. Petrusak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Temeko Manica
Represented By: Marc D. Kaszubski
Represented By: Nathan D. Petrusak
Represented By: Scott R. Ruark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kallel Martin
Represented By: Nathan D. Petrusak
Represented By: Marc D. Kaszubski
Represented By: Scott R. Ruark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?