Barker et al v. STA Management, LLC et al
Plaintiff: James Barker, Cheri Fritts and Aryn Delaney
Defendant: STA Management, LLC, Amer Asmar, Northwest Professionals, LLC, Hayat Asmar, Randy Asmar, Ronnie Asmar, RDR Services, LLC, Desiree Asmar, Fountain Oaks, LLC, Patrick Fisher, John Does 1-10, STA Management, LLC Doing business as Domino's Pizza and John Doe
Case Number: 2:2023cv11542
Filed: June 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Nancy G Edmunds
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2023 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Binkley on behalf of All Defendants. (Binkley, David)
August 17, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher P. Renz on behalf of All Defendants. (Renz, Christopher)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 AMENDED ORDER for Defendant to have Local Counsel file an Appearance by 8/31/2023 - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER for Defendant to Secure Local Counsel by August 31, 2023 - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #1 Complaint (Responsive Pleading due by 9/12/2023) - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER to Strike 19 Stipulation (Stipulations not permitted. Proposed Stipulation and Orders must be submitted through utilities as one document for Judge Edmunds review and approval) - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
August 14, 2023 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Ronnie Asmar served on 8/1/2023, answer due 8/22/2023. (Blanchard, David)
August 14, 2023 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. STA Management, LLC served on 8/1/2023, answer due 8/22/2023. (Blanchard, David)
August 8, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip Joseph Krzeski on behalf of All Defendants. (Krzeski, Philip)
August 8, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher P. Renz on behalf of All Defendants. (Renz, Christopher)
August 8, 2023 Filing 14 [INCORRECTLY FILED - ATTORNEY WILL RE-FILE APPEARANCE] NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher P. Renz on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Renz, Christopher) Modified on 8/8/2023 (NAhm).
August 4, 2023 Filing 13 [INCORRECTLY FILED - ATTORNEY WILL RE-FILE APPEARANCE] NOTICE of Appearance by Philip Joseph Krzeski on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Krzeski, Philip) Modified on 8/8/2023 (NAhm).
August 4, 2023 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Randy Asmar served on 8/1/2023, answer due 8/22/2023. (Blanchard, David)
August 4, 2023 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Amer Asmar served on 8/1/2023, answer due 8/22/2023. (Blanchard, David)
August 4, 2023 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Patrick Fisher served on 7/31/2023, answer due 8/21/2023. (Blanchard, David)
August 4, 2023 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Fountain Oaks, LLC served on 7/31/2023, answer due 8/21/2023. (Blanchard, David)
August 4, 2023 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Desiree Asmar served on 7/31/2023, answer due 8/21/2023. (Blanchard, David)
August 4, 2023 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. RDR Services, LLC served on 7/31/2023, answer due 8/21/2023. (Blanchard, David)
August 4, 2023 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Hayat Asmar served on 7/31/2023, answer due 8/21/2023. (Blanchard, David)
August 4, 2023 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Northwest Professionals, LLC served on 7/31/2023, answer due 8/21/2023. (Blanchard, David)
July 13, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Isabel Serrano on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Serrano, Katherine)
July 13, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs - Filing Opt-In Consent Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Opt-In Consent Forms) (Blanchard, David)
June 29, 2023 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (LGra)
June 29, 2023 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
June 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9399524 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan, 2:19-cv-11662, Judge Nancy G. Edmunds] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Consent Forms) (Blanchard, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barker et al v. STA Management, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Barker
Represented By: David M. Blanchard
Represented By: Katherine Isabel Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheri Fritts
Represented By: David M. Blanchard
Represented By: Katherine Isabel Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aryn Delaney
Represented By: David M. Blanchard
Represented By: Katherine Isabel Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STA Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amer Asmar
Represented By: Christopher P. Renz
Represented By: David A. Binkley
Represented By: Philip Joseph Krzeski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Professionals, LLC
Represented By: Christopher P. Renz
Represented By: David A. Binkley
Represented By: Philip Joseph Krzeski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hayat Asmar
Represented By: Christopher P. Renz
Represented By: David A. Binkley
Represented By: Philip Joseph Krzeski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Asmar
Represented By: Christopher P. Renz
Represented By: David A. Binkley
Represented By: Philip Joseph Krzeski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Asmar
Represented By: Christopher P. Renz
Represented By: David A. Binkley
Represented By: Philip Joseph Krzeski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RDR Services, LLC
Represented By: Philip Joseph Krzeski
Represented By: Christopher P. Renz
Represented By: David A. Binkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desiree Asmar
Represented By: Christopher P. Renz
Represented By: David A. Binkley
Represented By: Philip Joseph Krzeski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fountain Oaks, LLC
Represented By: Christopher P. Renz
Represented By: David A. Binkley
Represented By: Philip Joseph Krzeski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Fisher
Represented By: Christopher P. Renz
Represented By: David A. Binkley
Represented By: Philip Joseph Krzeski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STA Management, LLC Doing business as Domino's Pizza
Represented By: Christopher P. Renz
Represented By: David A. Binkley
Represented By: Philip Joseph Krzeski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Represented By: Christopher P. Renz
Represented By: David A. Binkley
Represented By: Philip Joseph Krzeski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?