Nova World International, LLC v. Business Circle, LLC et al
Plaintiff: NOVA WORLD INTERNATIONAL, LLC d/b/a NOVA SHIPPING and Nova World International, LLC Doing business as Nova Shipping
Defendant: BUSINESS CIRCLE, LLC and MUBEEN NISAR
Case Number: 2:2023cv11709
Filed: July 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Referring Judge: George Caram Steeh
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2023 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Business Circle, LLC served on 8/9/2023, answer due 8/30/2023; Mubeen Nisar served on 8/9/2023, answer due 8/30/2023. (Jordan, Kenderick)
July 25, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Koch on behalf of Nova World International, LLC. (Koch, Matthew)
July 25, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenderick Mason Jordan on behalf of Nova World International, LLC. (Jordan, Kenderick)
July 24, 2023 NOTICE of Error directed to: Kenderick Mason Jordan, Matthew Koch re #9 Notice of Appearance, #8 Notice of Appearance. Document is not flattened and contains fillable fields. Document was stricken and must be refiled correctly. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (NAhm)
July 21, 2023 Filing 9 [STRICKEN] NOTICE of Appearance by Kenderick Mason Jordan on behalf of Nova World International, LLC. (Jordan, Kenderick) Modified on 7/24/2023 (NAhm).
July 21, 2023 Filing 8 [STRICKEN] NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Koch on behalf of Nova World International, LLC. (Koch, Matthew) Modified on 7/24/2023 (NAhm).
July 21, 2023 Filing 7 [STRICKEN] NOTICE of Appearance by Kenderick Mason Jordan on behalf of Nova World International, LLC. (Jordan, Kenderick) Modified on 7/21/2023 (DAll).
July 21, 2023 Filing 6 [STRICKEN]NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Koch on behalf of Nova World International, LLC. (Koch, Matthew) Modified on 7/21/2023 (DAll).
July 21, 2023 NOTICE of Error directed to: Kenderick Mason Jordan re #7 Notice of Appearance. Document is not flattened and contains fillable fields. Document was stricken and must be refiled correctly. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (DAll)
July 21, 2023 NOTICE of Error directed to: Matthew Koch re #6 Notice of Appearance. Document is not flattened and contains fillable fields. Document was stricken and must be refiled correctly. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (DAll)
July 20, 2023 NOTICE of Error directed to: Kenderick Mason Jordan re #4 Notice of Appearance. Document is not flattened and contains fillable fields. Document was stricken and must be refiled correctly. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (DAll)
July 20, 2023 NOTICE of Error directed to: Matthew Koch re #5 Notice of Appearance. Document is not flattened and contains fillable fields. Document was stricken and must be refiled correctly. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (DAll)
July 18, 2023 Filing 5 [STRICKEN]NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Koch on behalf of Nova World International, LLC. (Koch, Matthew) Modified on 7/20/2023 (DAll).
July 18, 2023 Filing 4 [STRICKEN] NOTICE of Appearance by Kenderick Mason Jordan on behalf of Nova World International, LLC. (Jordan, Kenderick) Modified on 7/20/2023 (DAll).
July 18, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Mubeen Nisar* (DAll)
July 18, 2023 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Business Circle, LLC* (DAll)
July 18, 2023 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll)
July 17, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by NOVA WORLD INTERNATIONAL, LLC d/b/a NOVA SHIPPING against BUSINESS CIRCLE, LLC, MUBEEN NISAR. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9420742 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Camden. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Bill of Lading, #2 Exhibit 2 - Invoice) (Zwicker, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nova World International, LLC v. Business Circle, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NOVA WORLD INTERNATIONAL, LLC d/b/a NOVA SHIPPING
Represented By: Adam C. Zwicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nova World International, LLC Doing business as Nova Shipping
Represented By: Kenderick Mason Jordan
Represented By: Matthew Koch
Represented By: Adam C. Zwicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUSINESS CIRCLE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUBEEN NISAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?