Jones et al v. Goney et al
Plaintiff: Alexandra Jones and AS
Defendant: Cody N. Goney and Dingledine Trucking Company, Inc. Doing business as Dingledine Trucking
Case Number: 2:2023cv12215
Filed: August 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Linda V Parker
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 23 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Contract Real Estate
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2023 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #4 Notice of Removal, by Dingledine Trucking Company, Inc. (Groustra, Timothy)
October 27, 2023 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #1 Notice of Removal, by Dingledine Trucking Company, Inc. (Groustra, Timothy)
October 18, 2023 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #11 Order on Motion for Alternate Service by Alexandra Jones via 1st Class Mail to P. O. Box (Ceglarek, Joseph)
October 18, 2023 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #11 Order on Motion for Alternate Service by Alexandra Jones via Posting (Ceglarek, Joseph)
October 18, 2023 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #11 Order on Motion for Alternate Service by Alexandra Jones vis 1st Class Mail to P. O. Box (Ceglarek, Joseph)
October 18, 2023 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #11 Order on Motion for Alternate Service by Alexandra Jones via Certified & First Class Mail (Ceglarek, Joseph)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER (PHASE I): Discovery due by 4/5/2024, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 5/24/2024. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (Refer to image for additional dates) (AFla)
September 28, 2023 Minute Entry for telephonic proceedings before District Judge Linda V. Parker: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 9/28/2023. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (AFla)
September 27, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason R. Church on behalf of Dingledine Trucking Company, Inc.. (Church, Jason)
September 25, 2023 Filing 14 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Groustra, Timothy)
September 25, 2023 Filing 13 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Ceglarek, Joseph)
September 18, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS Issued for *Cody N. Goney* (DPer)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for alternative service and for extenion of summons. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (DPer)
September 17, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Alternate Service and Extend Summons by Alexandra Jones. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Police Report, #3 Exhibit Process Server Affidavits, #4 Exhibit Postal Verifications, #5 Exhibit LexisNexis Report) (Ceglarek, Joseph)
September 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFUNDING SECOND PAYMENT OF REMOVAL FILING FEE. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (AFla)
September 1, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Scheduling Conference set for 9/28/2023 10:30 AM before District Judge Linda V. Parker. (AFla)
August 31, 2023 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Dingledine Trucking Company, Inc. (Groustra, Timothy)
August 31, 2023 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Dingledine Trucking Company, Inc.. (Groustra, Timothy)
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING REMOVAL. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (AFla)
August 30, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Dingledine Trucking Company, Inc. from Macomb County Circuit Court, case number 23-002154-NI. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9473839 - Fee: $ 402 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (Groustra, Timothy)
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER STRIKING Notice of Removal #1 Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (TTho)
August 29, 2023 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Dingledine Trucking Company, Inc. (Groustra, Timothy)
August 29, 2023 Filing 1 [STRICKEN] NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Dingledine Trucking Company, Inc. d/b/a Dingledine Trucking from Macomb County Circuit Court, case number 23-002154-NI. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9472784 - Fee: $ 402 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (Groustra, Timothy) Modified on 8/30/2023 (TTho).
August 29, 2023 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DPer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones et al v. Goney et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandra Jones
Represented By: Joseph J. Ceglarek, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AS
Represented By: Joseph J. Ceglarek, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cody N. Goney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dingledine Trucking Company, Inc. Doing business as Dingledine Trucking
Represented By: Timothy S. Groustra
Represented By: Jason R. Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?