American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee et al v. US Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee, Adam Shapiro, Anas Shawkat Museitef, Haidar Darwish and Mohammed Ahmed Abujayyab
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of State, US Department of Homeland Security and US Department of State
Case Number: 2:2023cv12436
Filed: September 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Kimberly G Altman
Referring Judge: Laurie J Michelson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EPar)
November 9, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs without prejudice (Arraf, Huwaida)
October 5, 2023 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. US Department of State served on 10-02-2023. (Arraf, Huwaida)
September 29, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Ruth Ann Mueller on behalf of All Defendants. (Mueller, Ruth)
September 29, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Lynden King on behalf of All Defendants. (King, Sean)
September 28, 2023 Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT REQUIREMENTS. (EPar)
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Denying Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order or Preliminary Injunction and Stay #5 . Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EPar)
September 27, 2023 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Arraf, Huwaida)
September 27, 2023 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Office of the Attorney General served on September 27, 2023. (Arraf, Huwaida)
September 27, 2023 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Department of Homeland Security served on September 27, 2023. (Arraf, Huwaida)
September 27, 2023 Filing 8 EXHIBIT Corrected Exhibit 5, Arraf email to DHS 9-25-23 re #5 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order or Preliminary Injunction, and Stay and Brief in Support by All Plaintiffs (Arraf, Huwaida)
September 27, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued for the United States Attorney and the Office of the Attorney General. (DJen)
September 27, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued for *United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of State* (DJen)
September 27, 2023 Filing 5 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order or Preliminary Injunction, and Stay and Brief in Support by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Arraf email to Defs 9-26-23, #3 Exhibit Email delivery error report, #4 Exhibit Arraf affidavit, #5 Exhibit Shapiro affidavit, #6 Exhibit Arraf email to DHS 9-25-23) (Arraf, Huwaida)
September 27, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel W. Jarjour on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Jarjour, Samuel)
September 27, 2023 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DJen)
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Denying Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Motion for Preliminary Injunction #2 . Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EPar)
September 26, 2023 Filing 2 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Arraf, Huwaida)
September 26, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9503608 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: MACOMB - County Where Action Arose: Out of State - County of 1st Defendant: USA. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MOU (unofficial)) (Arraf, Huwaida)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee et al v. US Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee
Represented By: Huwaida Arraf
Represented By: Samuel W. Jarjour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Shapiro
Represented By: Huwaida Arraf
Represented By: Samuel W. Jarjour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anas Shawkat Museitef
Represented By: Huwaida Arraf
Represented By: Samuel W. Jarjour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haidar Darwish
Represented By: Huwaida Arraf
Represented By: Samuel W. Jarjour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammed Ahmed Abujayyab
Represented By: Huwaida Arraf
Represented By: Samuel W. Jarjour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Ruth Ann Mueller
Represented By: Sean Lynden King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of State
Represented By: Ruth Ann Mueller
Represented By: Sean Lynden King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?