Bell v. Washington et al
Plaintiff: Tyrone A. Bell
Defendant: Heidi Washington, Matt McCauley, Rander Rewers, Connie Horton, Shane Jackson, Sherman Campbell, Jack Kowaski, Gregroy Skipper, Sherry Burt, Tim O'Bell Winn, Fredeane Artis, John Doe and Dewayne Burton
Case Number: 2:2023cv12720
Filed: October 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Laurie J Michelson
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Referring Matters for Full Pretrial to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford re #19 Motion to Expedite, #20 Motion, #10 Motion, #18 Motion to Expedite. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (KSan)
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Partially Dismissing Complaint #5 and Related Motions [ #8 , #9 , #11 ]. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (KSan) Modified on 12/21/2023 (KSan).
December 21, 2023 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #23 Order on Motion for TRO, Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause, Order on Motion - Free, #24 Order Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge on Tyrone A. Bell,240434G. ROBERT COTTON CORRECTIONAL FACILITY,3500 N. ELM ROAD, JACKSON, MI 49201 (KSan)
December 20, 2023 Filing 22 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Fredeane Artis, Sherry Burt, Connie Horton, Matt McCauley, Rander Rewers, Heidi Washington, Tim O'Bell Winn (Ho, Joseph)
December 20, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Yung-Kuang Ho on behalf of Fredeane Artis, Sherry Burt, Connie Horton, Matt McCauley, Rander Rewers, Heidi Washington, Tim O'Bell Winn. (Ho, Joseph)
December 14, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION for declaratory judgment by Tyrone A. Bell. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation) (DPer)
December 6, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION to Expedite Consideration for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunctive Relief Hearing by Tyrone A. Bell. by Tyrone A. Bell. (DAll)
November 29, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION to Expedite Consideration for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunctive Relief by Tyrone A. Bell. (DAll)
November 22, 2023 Filing 16 Summonses Provided to Plaintiff(s) for Service (NAhm)
November 22, 2023 Filing 15 SUMMONS Issued for *Dewayne Burton* [Summons for Dewayne Burton were not issued initially] (NAhm)
November 21, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Proof of Pending Litigation by Tyrone A. Bell (SSch)
November 16, 2023 Filing 14 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (MCho)
November 13, 2023 Filing 13 BRIEF in Support of re #11 MOTION to Appear at Hearing via Videoconference Technology filed by Tyrone A. Bell. (SSch)
November 13, 2023 Filing 12 [STRICKEN] AMENDED Verified COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Tyrone A. Bell against All Defendants. [NEW PARTY ADDED] (SSch) Modified on 12/21/2023 (KSan).
November 9, 2023 Filing 7 Summonses Provided to Plaintiff(s) for Service (SSch)
November 9, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (SSch)
November 8, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear at Hearing via Videoconference Technology by Tyrone A. Bell. (SSch)
November 8, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Equitable and Injunctive Relief by Tyrone A. Bell. (SSch)
November 8, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Tyrone A. Bell. (SSch)
November 8, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Tyrone A. Bell. (SSch)
November 8, 2023 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Tyrone A. Bell against Fredeane Artis, Sherry Burt, Sherman Campbell, John Doe, Connie Horton, Shane Jackson, Jack Kowaski, Matt McCauley, Rander Rewers, Gregroy Skipper, Heidi Washington, Tim O'Bell Winn. (SSch)
November 8, 2023 FILING FEE Received in the amount of 402.00 by Tyrone A. Bell - Receipt No. 150007824 [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (Grew, Jennifer)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to Correct Deficiency for failure to submit filing fee. Correction due by 12/1/2023 Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (LGra)
October 30, 2023 Filing 3 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (DJen)
October 26, 2023 Filing 2 BRIEF in support of plaintiff motion for equitable Permanent Injuntive Relief by Tyrone A. Bell re #1 Complaint (LGra)
October 26, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Tyrone A. Bell against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Civil Cover Sheet) (LGra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell v. Washington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrone A. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heidi Washington
Represented By: Joseph Yung-Kuang Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt McCauley
Represented By: Joseph Yung-Kuang Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rander Rewers
Represented By: Joseph Yung-Kuang Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Horton
Represented By: Joseph Yung-Kuang Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherman Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Kowaski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregroy Skipper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry Burt
Represented By: Joseph Yung-Kuang Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim O'Bell Winn
Represented By: Joseph Yung-Kuang Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fredeane Artis
Represented By: Joseph Yung-Kuang Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dewayne Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?