Strickland v. Courtright et al
Plaintiff: Marco Strickland
Defendant: John T. Courtright, Lawrence Coogan and Paul Gustafson
Case Number: 2:2023cv12756
Filed: October 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sean F Cox
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2023 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT from U.S. Marshal Service of Receipt of Service of Process Documents for Lawrence Coogan, John T. Courtright, Paul Gustafson. Documents mailed by USMS on 12/14/23. (TTho)
December 1, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued for *Lawrence Coogan, John T. Courtright, Paul Gustafson* (JOwe)
December 1, 2023 Service Documents Received (JOwe)
November 17, 2023 Filing 7 Document from Marco Strickland (SSch)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Complete Service Documents and for Service of Process by the US Marshal. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
November 3, 2023 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #6 Order Directing Service by the US Marshal and #5 Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs on Marco Strickland at 17419 Prospect, Melvindale, MI 48122 (JMcC)
November 1, 2023 Filing 4 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (MCho)
October 30, 2023 Filing 2 APPLICATION to proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Marco Strickland. (DPer)
October 30, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Marco Strickland against defendants (DPer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strickland v. Courtright et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marco Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John T. Courtright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Coogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?