Gordon et al v. City of Hamtramck et al
Plaintiff: Russ Gordon and Cathy Stackpoole
Defendant: Hamtramck, City of, Hamtramck City Council and Amer Ghalib
Case Number: 2:2023cv12812
Filed: November 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: David M Lawson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1343 Violation of Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2023 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses Answer to Amended Complaint by Amer Ghalib, Hamtramck City Council, Hamtramck, City of. (Odetalla, Odetalla)
December 21, 2023 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Amer Ghalib, Hamtramck City Council, Hamtramck, City of. (Odetalla, Odetalla)
December 15, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE OF IN PERSON HEARING on #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #13 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct #11 Order on #5 Amended Document. Motion Hearing set for 3/13/2024 at 3:00 PM before District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin)
December 9, 2023 Filing 14 REQUEST by All Plaintiffs. (Susselman, Marc) Modified on 12/12/2023 (LGra). [WRONG EVENT USED DOCUMENT IS TITLED: PLAINTIFFS AMENDED MOTION FOR ENTRY OF A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION] Modified on 12/12/2023 (LGra).
December 9, 2023 Filing 13 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct #11 Order on Motion - Free, #5 Amended Document by All Plaintiffs. (Susselman, Marc)
December 9, 2023 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #5 Amended Document by All Plaintiffs (Susselman, Marc)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Denying Motions #7 and #9 . Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin)
December 7, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE TO APPEAR IN PERSON: Scheduling Conference set for 1/23/2024 at 10:00 AM before District Judge David M. Lawson. See image for document deadline. (SPin)
December 6, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for summary judgment by All Plaintiffs. (Susselman, Marc)
December 6, 2023 Filing 8 [Motion] APPLICATION by All Plaintiffs. (Susselman, Marc) Modified on 12/7/2023 (MCho).
December 6, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION summary judgment re #5 Amended Document by All Plaintiffs. (Susselman, Marc)
December 6, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Odey K. Meroueh on behalf of All Defendants. (Meroueh, Odey)
November 17, 2023 Filing 5 AMENDED #1 Complaint,, by All Plaintiffs (Susselman, Marc)
November 17, 2023 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #3 Summons Issued by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation, #2 Document Continuation) (Susselman, Marc)
November 6, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (MCho)
November 6, 2023 Filing 2 COMPLAINT Civil Covwe Sheet filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Fee Required - Fee Not Paid. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Susselman, Marc)
November 6, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Exhibits filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9552099 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Susselman, Marc)
November 6, 2023 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (MCho)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gordon et al v. City of Hamtramck et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russ Gordon
Represented By: Marc M. Susselman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Stackpoole
Represented By: Marc M. Susselman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamtramck, City of
Represented By: Odetalla M. Odetalla
Represented By: Odey K. Meroueh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamtramck City Council
Represented By: Odetalla M. Odetalla
Represented By: Odey K. Meroueh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amer Ghalib
Represented By: Odetalla M. Odetalla
Represented By: Odey K. Meroueh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?