ABG Images (UK) Ltd et al v. Velvet Bulldog, LLC et al
Plaintiff: ABG Images (UK) Ltd trading as Iconic Images Limited, Douglas Kirkland, ABG Images (UK) Ltd Doing business as Iconic Images Limited and Douglas Morley Kirkland
Defendant: Velvet Bulldog, LLC d/b/a Robert Kidd Gallery, Gerard Marti and Velvet Bulldog, LLC Doing business as Robert Kidd Gallery
Case Number: 2:2023cv12852
Filed: November 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Curtis Ivy
Referring Judge: Matthew F Leitman
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for Plaintiff(s) to Show Cause Why This Case Should Not be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute. Show Cause Response due by 1/2/2024. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
November 26, 2023 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Velvet Bulldog, LLC served on 11/22/2023, answer due 12/13/2023. (Dunne, Joseph)
November 26, 2023 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Gerard Marti served on 11/20/2023, answer due 12/11/2023. (Dunne, Joseph)
November 13, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Velvet Bulldog, LLC* (SSch)
November 13, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Gerard Marti* (SSch)
November 13, 2023 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SSch)
November 9, 2023 Filing 2 Copyright Report Sent To Washington (Dunne, Joseph)
November 9, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement (Injunctive Relief Demanded) filed by ABG Images (UK) Ltd trading as Iconic Images Limited, Douglas Kirkland against Gerard Marti, Velvet Bulldog, LLC d/b/a Robert Kidd Gallery with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9557497 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of Country - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Registration Certificate, #2 Exhibit 2 - Infringement, #3 - Civil Cover Sheet, #4 - Proposed Summons as to Velvet Bulldog, #5 - Proposed Summons as to Gerard Marti) (Dunne, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ABG Images (UK) Ltd et al v. Velvet Bulldog, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABG Images (UK) Ltd trading as Iconic Images Limited
Represented By: Joseph A. Dunne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Kirkland
Represented By: Joseph A. Dunne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABG Images (UK) Ltd Doing business as Iconic Images Limited
Represented By: Joseph A. Dunne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Morley Kirkland
Represented By: Joseph A. Dunne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velvet Bulldog, LLC d/b/a Robert Kidd Gallery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerard Marti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velvet Bulldog, LLC Doing business as Robert Kidd Gallery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?