Zawideh v. Abbott Laboratories et al
Plaintiff: Robert S. Zawideh
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Diabetes Care Inc. and Abbott Diabetes Care Sales Corp.
Interested Party: Howard B. Goldman
Case Number: 2:2023cv12993
Filed: November 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Terrence G Berg
Referring Judge: Jonathan JC Grey
2 Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION to Remand by Robert S. Zawideh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proof of Service) (Grekin, Joseph)
December 27, 2023 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #15 Notice of Appearance by Robert S. Zawideh (Hillary, Kim)
December 27, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Kim K. Hillary on behalf of Robert S. Zawideh. (Hillary, Kim)
December 27, 2023 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #13 Notice of Appearance by Robert S. Zawideh (Grekin, Joseph)
December 27, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph K. Grekin on behalf of Robert S. Zawideh. (Grekin, Joseph)
December 5, 2023 Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Andrew J. Broder appearing on behalf of Howard B. Goldman (Broder, Andrew)
December 5, 2023 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Interested Party Howard B. Goldman. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF (Broder, Andrew)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATED ORDER Setting Dates for Filing Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and Defendants' Pre-Answer Motions, ( Motion for Remand due for 12/27/2023), ( Response due by 2/23/2024;, Reply due by 3/8/2024) Signed by District Judge Jonathan J.C. Grey. (SOso)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER of RECUSAL and REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Paul D. Borman to District Judge Jonathan J.C. Grey. (SSch)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER of DISQUALIFICATION and REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Terrence G. Berg to District Judge Paul D. Borman. (SSch)
November 29, 2023 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Robert S. Zawideh appearing on behalf of Robert S. Zawideh (Zawideh, Robert)
November 29, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey Potter on behalf of Abbott Diabetes Care Inc., Abbott Diabetes Care Sales Corp., Abbott Laboratories. (Potter, Geoffrey)
November 28, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark T. Nelson on behalf of All Defendants. (Nelson, Mark)
November 28, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick A. Berg on behalf of All Defendants. (Berg, Frederick)
November 28, 2023 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (KBro)
November 27, 2023 Filing 4 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Abbott Diabetes Care Sales Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Abbott Laboratories for Abbott Diabetes Care Sales Corp.. (Berg, Frederick)
November 27, 2023 Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Abbott Diabetes Care Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Abbott Laboratories for Abbott Diabetes Care Inc.. (Berg, Frederick)
November 27, 2023 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Abbott Laboratories (Berg, Frederick)
November 27, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Oakland County Probate Court, case number 2023-416,797 TV. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9572075 - Fee: $ 402 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A: Verified Petition for Limited Supervision of Trust and for Declaratory Relief filed with the Oakland County Probate Court, #3 Exhibit B: Copy of Petition (Ex. A hereto) filed on October 26, 2023, on the docket in the New York Action, [ECF No. 1969 therein], #4 Exhibit C: Copies of unpublished cases) (Berg, Frederick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zawideh v. Abbott Laboratories et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert S. Zawideh
Represented By: Robert S. Zawideh
Represented By: Joseph K. Grekin
Represented By: Kim K. Hillary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Represented By: Frederick A. Berg
Represented By: Geoffrey Potter
Represented By: Mark T. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Diabetes Care Inc.
Represented By: Frederick A. Berg
Represented By: Geoffrey Potter
Represented By: Mark T. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Diabetes Care Sales Corp.
Represented By: Frederick A. Berg
Represented By: Geoffrey Potter
Represented By: Mark T. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Howard B. Goldman
Represented By: Andrew J. Broder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?