Bartlett v. Rardin
Petitioner: Alan Michael Bartlett and Alan Michael Bartlett [E-filer]
Respondent: Eric Rardin
Case Number: 2:2023cv13029
Filed: November 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Kimberly G Altman
Referring Judge: Matthew F Leitman
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Alan Michael Bartlett [E-filer]. (DAll)
December 19, 2023 Pro Se E-filing Access Given to Alan Michael Bartlett [E-filer]. (TTho)
December 15, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Alan Michael Bartlett. [Submitted through Pro Se Portal] (SSch)
December 11, 2023 HABEAS FILING FEE Received in the amount of 5.00 by Alan Michael Bartlett - Receipt No. 150008267 [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (Grew, Jennifer)
December 4, 2023 Filing 4 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (DJen)
November 30, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE [of no-consent to Judgment by Magistrate Judge] by Alan Michael Bartlett (DJen)
November 30, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Appointment of Investigator by Alan Michael Bartlett. (DJen)
November 30, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Alan Michael Bartlett against Eric Rardin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (DJen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bartlett v. Rardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alan Michael Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alan Michael Bartlett [E-filer]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Eric Rardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?