Burgess v. Michigan First Credit Union et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer Burgess
Defendant: Michigan First Credit Union, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Equifax Information Services, LLC
Case Number: 2:2023cv13044
Filed: November 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Curtis Ivy
Referring Judge: Matthew F Leitman
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jennifer Burgess as to Equifax Information Services, LLC (Panvini, Joseph)
January 25, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jennifer Burgess as to Michigan First Credit Union (Panvini, Joseph)
January 24, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE by Jennifer Burgess of Settlement as to Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Panvini, Joseph)
January 11, 2024 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 12/14/2023, answer due 1/4/2024. (Panvini, Joseph)
January 8, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE by Jennifer Burgess of Settlement as to Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC (Panvini, Joseph)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATED ORDER Regarding Time for Defendant Michigan First Credit Union to Respond to the #1 Complaint. Response due by 1/29/2024. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
December 19, 2023 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michael V. Krempa appearing on behalf of Michigan First Credit Union (Krempa, Michael)
December 19, 2023 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Charles Holzman appearing on behalf of Michigan First Credit Union (Holzman, Charles)
December 11, 2023 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Equifax Information Services, LLC waiver sent on 12/8/2023, answer due 2/6/2024. (Panvini, Joseph)
December 1, 2023 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (NAhm)
December 1, 2023 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (NAhm)
November 30, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Jennifer Burgess against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Michigan First Credit Union with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9577909 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Panvini, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burgess v. Michigan First Credit Union et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Burgess
Represented By: Joseph Michael Panvini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan First Credit Union
Represented By: Charles Holzman
Represented By: Michael V. Krempa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?