Rogers v. Internal Revenue Service et al
Plaintiff: Jonas Lavarus Rogers
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service and IRS, Commissioner of
Case Number: 2:2023cv13073
Filed: December 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Kimberly G Altman
Referring Judge: Matthew F Leitman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2023 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Jonas Lavarus Rogers re #4 Regarding Parties Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (DAll)
December 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Complete Service Documents and for Service of Process by the US Marshal. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
December 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
December 13, 2023 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #5 Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs, #6 Directing Service by the US Marshal on Jonas Lavarus Rogers at 14200 W. 8 Mile Rd., Unite 47112, Oak Park, MI 48237. (HRya)
December 7, 2023 Filing 4 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (MCho)
December 5, 2023 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Jonas Lavarus Rogers. (DAll)
December 5, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Jonas Lavarus Rogers against IRS, Commissioner of, Internal Revenue Service (DAll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rogers v. Internal Revenue Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonas Lavarus Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IRS, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?