Perry v. Silverthon
Plaintiff: Casey H. Perry
Defendant: Ryan Silverthon
Case Number: 2:2024cv10194
Filed: January 24, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Curtis Ivy
Referring Judge: Linda V Parker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2024 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT from U.S. Marshal Service of Receipt of Service of Process Documents for Ryan Silverthon. Documents mailed by USMS on 3/14/2024. (DJen)
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER directing service without prepayment of costs and authorizing the US Marshal to collect costs after service is made. Signed by Magistrate Judge Curtis Ivy, Jr. (SKra)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Referring Matters for Full Pretrial to Magistrate Judge Curtis Ivy, Jr. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (AFla)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #8 MOTION Exclusion from Early Mediation Program re #6 Order Staying Case filed by Ryan Silverthon AND LIFTING STAY - Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly G. Altman. (CCie)
March 6, 2024 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #9 Order Lifting Stay,, Terminate Motions on Casey H. Perry 244528 at MACOMB CORRECTIONAL FACILITY 34625 26 MILE ROAD LENOX TOWNSHIP, MI 48048 (CCie)
March 6, 2024 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #10 Order Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge mailed to: Casey H. Perry at 244528 MACOMB CORRECTIONAL FACILITY 34625 26 MILE ROAD LENOX TOWNSHIP, MI 48048 (AFla)
March 5, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION Exclusion from Early Mediation Program re #6 Order Staying Case by Ryan Silverthon. (DeCarlo, Lindsay)
March 5, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay Elizabeth DeCarlo on behalf of Ryan Silverthon. (DeCarlo, Lindsay)
February 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER STAYING CASE and Referral to the Pro Se Prisoner Early Mediation Program Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (AFla)
February 26, 2024 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #6 Order Staying Case mailed to: Casey H. Perry at 244528 MACOMB CORRECTIONAL FACILITY 34625 26 MILE ROAD LENOX TOWNSHIP, MI 48048 (AFla)
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs and Directing Payment of an Initial Partial Filing Fee in the amount of $0 and subsequent payments. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (JHea)
January 26, 2024 Filing 4 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (MCho)
January 25, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Mediation Program (LGra)
January 24, 2024 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Casey H. Perry. (LGra)
January 24, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Casey H. Perry against Ryan Silverthon (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Civl Cover Sheet) (LGra) (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/25/2024) (LGra).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perry v. Silverthon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casey H. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Silverthon
Represented By: Lindsay Elizabeth DeCarlo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?